EP3700336 - AN INSECT TRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pelsis Limited Sterling House Grimbald Crag Close Knaresborough North Yorkshire HG5 8PJ / GB | [2023/23] |
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states Brandenburg (UK) Limited 29 Navigation Drive Hurst Business Park Brierley Hill West Midlands DY5 1UT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAYE, Mathew Varghese c/o Brandenburg (UK) Limited 29 Navigation Drive Hurst Business Park Brierley Hill West Midlands DY5 1UT / GB | 02 /
BAPTISTA, Carl c/o Brandenburg (UK) Limited 29 Navigation Drive Hurst Business Park Brierley Hill West Midlands DY5 1UT / GB | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/41] | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2020/36] | Schiller, Dominic Christopher Equipped 4 (IP) Limited 47 Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 5AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 18801043.3 | 22.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018IB58199 | Priority number, date | GB20170017415 | 23.10.2017 Original published format: GB 201717415 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019082051 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700336 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3700336 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01M1/04 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
A01M1/04 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A01M1/026 (US);
A01M1/106 (US);
A01M1/14 (KR);
A01M1/145 (GB,KR,US);
A01M1/2016 (KR);
A01M1/223 (KR);
A01M1/24 (KR);
A01M1/165 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSEKTENFALLE | [2020/36] | English: | AN INSECT TRAP | [2020/36] | French: | PIÈGE POUR LES INSECTES | [2023/15] |
Former [2020/36] | PIÈGE À INSECTES | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 19.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]GB2420957 (STV INTERNAT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,8,9,15-19 * abstract * [A] 7,11 [Y] 10,12 [I] 5,6,13,14; | [Y]GB2459717 (BRANDENBURG [GB]) [Y] 12 * page 7, paragraph middle *; | [Y]KR20160002140 (CHUNWOO ENVIRONMENT SERVICE CO [KR]) [Y] 10* u-shape; paragraph [0087] * |