EP3704156 - CD38-DIRECTED CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTOR CONSTRUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorrento Therapeutics, Inc. 4955 Directors Place San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yanliang 10945 Corte Mejillones San Diego California 92130 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Heyue 15732 Potomac Ridge Road San Diego California 92127 / US | 03 /
MA, Qianzhong 4955 Directors Place San Diego California 92121 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 18801058.1 | 02.11.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018IB58642 | Priority number, date | US201762581466P | 03.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762581466 P | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019087151 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3704156 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/0011 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR);
A61K39/4631 (EP,KR);
A61K39/464426 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (KR);
C07K14/7051 (US);
C07K14/70517 (US);
C07K14/70521 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/5156 (US);
A61K2039/5158 (US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,KR);
A61K2239/38 (EP,KR);
A61K2239/48 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/30 (KR);
C07K2317/73 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | CD38-GERICHTETE CHIMÄRE ANTIGENREZEPTORKONSTRUKTE | [2020/37] | English: | CD38-DIRECTED CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTOR CONSTRUCTS | [2020/37] | French: | CONSTRUCTIONS DE RÉCEPTEUR ANTIGÉNIQUE CHIMÉRIQUE DIRIGÉ CONTRE CD38 | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 28.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2022 | Observations by third parties | 03.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/41] | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2015121454 (CELLECTIS [FR]) [I] 1-30 * example all *; | [I]WO2017025323 (CELLECTIS [FR]) [I] 1-30 * figure all; example all *; | [I] - E. DRENT ET AL, "Pre-clinical evaluation of CD38 chimeric antigen receptor engineered T cells for the treatment of multiple myeloma", HAEMATOLOGICA, THE HEMATOLOGY JOURNAL : OFFICIAL ORGAN OF THE EUROPEAN HEMATOLOGY ASSOCIATION, IT, (20160208), vol. 101, no. 5, doi:10.3324/haematol.2015.137620, ISSN 0390-6078, pages 616 - 625, XP055460439 [I] 1-30 * figure all * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3324/haematol.2015.137620 | [I] - ESTHER DRENT, "CD38 Chimeric Antigen Receptor Engineered T Cells As Therapeutic Tools for Multiple Myeloma", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20141201), vol. 124, no. 21, ISSN 0006-4971, page 4759, XP009187479 [I] 1-30 * the whole document * | [I] - Sorrento Therapeutics ET AL, "Sorrento's TNK Therapeutics Provides Progress Update for its Anti-CD38 and CD123 CAR-T Programs for Treatment of Hematological Malignancies", (20161201), URL: https://www.prnewswire.com/news-releases/sorrentos-tnk-therapeutics-provides-progress-update-for-its-anti-cd38-and-cd123-car-t-programs-for-treatment-of-hematological-malignancies-300371312.html, (20181204), XP055529817 [I] 1-30 * the whole document * | [I] - DJORDJE ATANACKOVIC ET AL, "Immunotherapies targeting CD38 in Multiple Myeloma", ONCOIMMUNOLOGY, (20160805), vol. 5, no. 11, doi:10.1080/2162402X.2016.1217374, page e1217374, XP055505109 [I] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/2162402X.2016.1217374 | by applicant | US4946778 | US6696245 | US6846634 | WO2012031744 | WO2014055668 | US8802374 | WO2016012623 | US2016152723 | US2016297888 | - TANIGUCHI et al., Blood, (20070000), vol. 110, pages 2020 - 2023 | - LEISEGANG, M.; WILDE, S.; SPRANGER, S.; MILOSEVIC, S.; FRANKENBERGER, B.; UCKERT, W.; SCHENDEL, D. J., "MHC-restricted fratricide of human lymphocytes expressing surviving-specific transgenic T cell receptors", The Journal of Clinical Investigation, (20100000), vol. 120, doi:doi:10.1172/JCI43437, pages 3869 - 3877, XP055103910 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI43437 | - SCHENDEL, D. J.; FRANKENBERGER, B., "Limitations for TCR gene therapy by MHC-restricted fratricide and TCR-mediated hematopoietic stem cell toxicity", Oncoimmunology, (20130000), vol. 2, page e22410 | - FERLAY et al., Int. J. Cancer, (20150000), vol. 136, no. 5, pages E359 - 386 | - KUMAR et al., Blood, (20080000), vol. 111, no. 5, pages 2516 - 2520 | - KHARFAN-DABAJA et al., J. Hematol. Oncol., (20130000), vol. 6, page 2 | - ESHAR et al., Proc. Nat'l. Acad. of Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, no. 2, pages 720 - 724 | - GROSS et al., Proc. Nat'l. Acad. of Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, no. 24, pages 10024 - 10028 | - HAYNES et al., The Journal of Immunology, (20010000), vol. 166, no. 1, pages 182 - 187 | - FINNEY et al., Journal of Immunology, (19980000), vol. 161, no. 6, pages 2791 - 2797 | - HOMBACH et al., Journal of Immunology, (20010000), vol. 167, no. 11, pages 6123 - 6131 | - MAHER et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20020000), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 70 - 77 | - EMTAGE et al., Clinical Cancer Research, (20080000), vol. 14, no. 24, pages 8112 - 8812 | - LO et al., Clinical Cancer Research, (20100000), vol. 16, no. 10, pages 2769 - 2780 | - GOEDDEL, Gene Expression Technology: Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, (19900000), vol. 185 | - BARON et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19950000), vol. 23, pages 3605 - 3606 | - GENTRY et al., Leuk. Res., (20040000), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 307 - 313 | - GLUZMAN et al., Cell, (19810000), vol. 23, page 175 | - RASMUSSEN et al., Cytotechnology, (19980000), vol. 28, page 31 | - URLAUB et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - MCMAHAN et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, page 2821 | - GROSS, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 10024 - 10028 | - SAKEMURA, Cancer Immunology Research, (20160000), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 658 - 668 | - ESHHAR et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, no. 2, pages 720 - 724 | - MA et al., Cancer Chemother. Bio. I Response Modif., (20020000), vol. 20, pages 315 - 341 | - KORTT et al., Prot. Eng., (19970000), vol. 10, page 423 | - KORTT et al., Biomol. Eng., (20010000), vol. 18, pages 95 - 108 | - KRIANGKUM et al., Biomol. Eng., (20010000), vol. 18, pages 31 - 40 | - BIRD, Science, (19880000), vol. 242, page 423 | - HUSTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 5879 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 334, page 544 | - DE GRAAF et al., Methods Mol. Biol., (20020000), vol. 178, pages 379 - 387 | - BAROSI et al., Ann. Hematol., (20120000), vol. 91, no. 6, pages 875 - 888 | - DEAGLIO et al., J. Immunol., (19980000), vol. 160, no. 1, pages 395 - 402 | - SANDOVAL-MONTES; SANTOS-ARGUMEDO, J. Leukocyte Biol., (20050000), vol. 77, no. 4, pages 513 - 521 | - MIHARA et al., J. Immunother., (20090000), vol. 32, no. 7, pages 737 - 743 | - MIHARA et al., Br. J. Haematol., vol. 151, no. 1, pages 37 - 46 | - BHATTACHARYYA et al., Blood Cancer J, (20120000), vol. 2, no. 6, page e75 | - DRENT et al., Haematologica, (20160000), vol. 101, no. 5, pages 616 - 625 | - DALTON et al., Cancer Research, (19860000), vol. 46, pages 5125 - 5130 | - GENTY et al., Leuk Res, (20040000), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 307 - 313 | - GREGORINI, TOMASETTI et al., Cell Biology International, (20060000), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 727 - 732 | - MA et al., The Prostate, (20040000), vol. 61, pages 12 - 25 | - MA et al., The Prostate, (20140000), vol. 74, no. 3, pages 286 - 296 | other | - DRENT et al., "A Rational Strategy for Reducing On-Target Off-Tumor Effects of CD38-Chimeric Antigen Receptors by Affinity Optimization", Molecular Therapy, (20170000), vol. 25, no. 8, doi:10.1016/j.ymthe.2017.04.024, pages 1946 - 1958, XP002792653 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymthe.2017.04.024 |