EP3700464 - SYSTEMS FOR PROTECTING THE CEREBRAL VASCULATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/36] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROTECTING THE CEREBRAL VASCULATURE | ||
[2023/39] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PURCELL, Cameron Paul 222 Jean Drive Santa Rosa California 95405 / US | 02 /
FIELDS, Antony J. 1745 Copperhill Pkwy Suite 1 Santa Rosa California 95403 / US | 03 /
HAMILL, Whittaker Ian 1745 Copperhill Pkwy Suite 1 Santa Rosa California 95403 / US | 04 /
FIFER, Daniel Wayne 6158 Lockwood Dr. Windsor California 95492 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2020/36] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18801213.2 | 29.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018US57978 | Priority number, date | US201762577870P | 27.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762577870 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019084541 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700464 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3700464 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/01 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/012 (EP,US);
A61F2/013 (EP,US);
A61M25/0147 (US);
A61F2/011 (US);
A61F2002/016 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0014 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUM SCHUTZ DER ZEREBRALEN VASKULATUR | [2023/39] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR PROTECTING THE CEREBRAL VASCULATURE | [2023/39] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE PROTECTION DU SYSTÈME VASCULAIRE CÉRÉBRAL | [2023/39] |
Former [2020/36] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ DER ZEREBRALEN VASKULATUR | ||
Former [2020/36] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROTECTING THE CEREBRAL VASCULATURE | ||
Former [2020/36] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PROTECTION DU SYSTÈME VASCULAIRE CÉRÉBRAL | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 27.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24157176.9 / EP4378421 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006076505 (ORTACO INC [US], et al); | [A]US2009326575 (GALDONIK JASON A [US], et al); | [A]US2010191276 (LASHINSKI RANDALL T [US]); | [D]US8876796 (FIFER DANIEL W [US], et al); | [X]US2016310255 (PURCELL CAMERON PAUL [US], et al) | by applicant | US8876796 | US9492264 | US9566144 |