EP3626266 - PD-L1 ANTIBODY PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangsu Hengrui Medicine Co., Ltd. No. 7 Kunlunshan Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Lianyungang Jiangsu 222047 / CN | For all designated states Shanghai Hengrui Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd No.279 Wenjin Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Minhang District Shanghai 200245 / CN | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Zhen No.279 Wenjing Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Minhang District Shanghai 200245 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Jianjian No.279 Wenjing Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Minhang District Shanghai 200245 / CN | 03 /
YAN, Xiaodan No.279 Wenjing Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Minhang District Shanghai 200245 / CN | 04 /
WU, Shan No.279 Wenjing Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Minhang District Shanghai 200245 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Xun No.279 Wenjing Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Minhang District Shanghai 200245 / CN | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18801322.1 | 15.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018CN86866 | Priority number, date | CN201710341680 | 16.05.2017 Original published format: CN201710341680 | [2020/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018210230 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626266 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K16/28 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
C07K16/2827 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/39591 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/00 (RU);
A61K39/395 (RU);
A61K47/12 (KR,RU,US);
A61K47/14 (KR,RU);
A61K47/26 (KR,RU,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,RU);
C07K16/00 (RU);
C07K16/28 (RU);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE CTLA4-ANTIKÖRPER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/13] | English: | PD-L1 ANTIBODY PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF | [2020/13] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE À BASE D'ANTICORPS ANTI-PD-L1 ET SON UTILISATION | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2019 | Translation filed | 04.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007005874 (MEDAREX INC [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * examples 1-13 *; | [XI]WO2010077634 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13,16,17 * page 59, line 8 - page 60, line 16 ; page 99, line 19 - page 101, line 9;; examples 2,3,7-9 * [I] 14,15; | [I]WO2011066389 (MEDIMMMUNE LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-17 * examples 13-19 *; | [A] - BRITTANY K. CHAVEZ ET AL, "Improved Stability of a Model IgG3 by DoE-Based Evaluation of Buffer Formulations", BIOMED RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL, (20160101), vol. 2016, doi:10.1155/2016/2074149, ISSN 2314-6133, pages 1 - 8, XP055494692 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2016/2074149 | [A] - DEBORAH S. GOLDBERG ET AL, "Formulation Development of Therapeutic Monoclonal Antibodies Using High-Throughput Fluorescence and Static Light Scattering Techniques: Role of Conformational and Colloidal Stability", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, US, (20101019), vol. 100, no. 4, doi:10.1002/jps.22371, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1306 - 1315, XP055768727 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.22371 | International search | [XA]CN105793288 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [X] 1-10, 13, 16-17[A] 11-12, 14-15; | [PY]WO2017084495 (JIANGSU HENGRUI MEDICINE CO [CN], et al) [PY] 11-12, 14-15, 17; | [PXY]CN107198773 (WUXI BIOLOGICS(SHANGHAI) CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-10, 13, 16 [PY] 11-12, 14-15, 17 | by applicant | CN103429264 | CN105793288 | CN105960415 | - J. Biol. Chern., (19680000), vol. 243, page 3558 | - WATSON et al., Antibody Experimental Technology Guide of Cold Spring Harbor, The Benjamin/Cummings Pub. Co.,, (19870000), page 224 |