EP3610316 - FIXED FOCUS IMAGE LIGHT GUIDE WITH ZONED DIFFRACTION GRATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vuzix Corporation 25 Hendrix Road, Suite A West Henrietta, New York 14586 / US | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTZ, Robert, J. 913 Taylor Rise Victor, NY 14567 / US | 02 /
KOWARZ, Marek, W. 3 Portofino Circle Henrietta, NY 14467 / US | 03 /
TRAVERS, Paul, J. 91 Boughton Hill Road Honeoye Falls, NY 14472 / US | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Nymphenburger Straße 20 80335 München / DE | [2023/10] |
Former [2020/08] | Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 20 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18801328.8 | 03.05.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018US30821 | Priority number, date | US201762507550P | 17.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762507550 P | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018213009 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3610316 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3610316 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00, G02B27/01, G02B30/22, G02B27/42, F21V8/00 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G02B27/0081 (EP);
G02B27/4205 (EP);
G02B30/34 (EP);
G02B6/0016 (US);
G02B6/0038 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | G02B27/00, G02B27/01, G02B27/22, G02B27/42, F21V8/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTFOKUSBILDLICHTLEITER MIT ZONIERTEN BEUGUNGSGITTERN | [2020/08] | English: | FIXED FOCUS IMAGE LIGHT GUIDE WITH ZONED DIFFRACTION GRATINGS | [2020/08] | French: | GUIDE DE LUMIÈRE D'IMAGE À FOYER FIXE AVEC RÉSEAUX DE DIFFRACTION EN ZONES | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21186747.8 / EP3916465 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | IT | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | IE | 03.05.2023 | LU | 03.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
IE | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
IE | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015241705 (ABOVITZ RONY [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 3C,5B *; | [Y]US2015346490 (TEKOLSTE ROBERT D [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 14,1C,1E,12B,7 *; | [Y]WO2017039820 (LEIA INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1D,4A-4D * | International search | [YA]EP0981065 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [Y] 1-3, 13-21, 23 & 28-29 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0017], [0025] & [0080]; figure 14G * [A] 4-12, 22, 24-27 & 30-36; | [A]US2009040580 (MUKAWA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-36* ; abstract, figures 5, 7, paragraphs [0047]-[0048], [0051] *; | [A]US8531772 (CHANN BIEN [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * ; column 4, lines 10-20 *; | [YA]EP2748659 (VUZIX CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3, 13-21, 23 & 28-29 * ; abstract, paragraphs [0001], [0013], [0015], [0019]-[0022], [0023], claim 1, figures 1 & 2 * [A] 4-12, 22, 24-27 & 30-36 | by applicant | US2015346490 | WO2017039820 |