EP3625295 - DIELECTRIC INK COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpha Assembly Solutions Inc. 245 Freight Street Waterbury, CT 06702 / US | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUJARI, Narahari B-410 Century Marvel Kempapura Bangalore 560024 / IN | 02 /
SUNDARAMURTHY, Jayaprakash No. 29/1 (18) I-Main II-Block Nandini Layout Bangalore 560096 / IN | 03 /
SARKAR, Siuli C24 Prakash Citadel Apartment Muninagappa Layout Kaval Byrasandra Bangalore 560032 / IN | 04 /
BHATKAL, Ravindra, M 48 Berkshire Way East Brunswick NJ 08816 / US | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18801698.4 | 14.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018US32503 | Priority number, date | US201762506095P | 15.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762506095 P | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018213161 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3625295 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/101 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/322 (US);
B41F15/40 (US);
B41M5/0023 (US);
C09D11/037 (US);
C09D11/102 (US);
C09D11/104 (US);
C09D11/107 (US);
C09D11/38 (US);
H05K1/0393 (US);
H05K3/0011 (US);
C09D11/30 (US);
H05K2201/0133 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D11/10, C09D11/52 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | C09D11/00, C09D11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | DIELEKTRISCHE TINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/13] | English: | DIELECTRIC INK COMPOSITION | [2020/13] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENCRE DIÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 14.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2904321B ; | [XI]JP2000038534 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [XI]CN103224735 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH); | [XI]US2014151606 (LOWENTHAL MARK DAVID [US], et al); | [XI]US2015064417 (CHOI SUNGHO [KR], et al); | [XI]JP2016139153 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD, et al) | International search | [A]WO2012045736 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [A]WO2012078820 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US], et al); | [X]US2014151607 (LOWENTHAL MARK DAVID [US], et al); | [X]WO2015087350 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]); | [A]WO2016060838 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US]) | by applicant | US3615455 | US3746662 | US4061584 | US4425263 | US4592961 | JP2904321B | JP2000038534 | US2003121767 | US6956098 | US2008257706 | US8659158 | US2014151606 | WO2014085473 | US8767378 | CN103224735B | US2015064417 | WO2016012753 | WO2016014504 | CN105315788 | JP2016028165 | JP2016139153 | US9441126 |