EP3514862 - ELECTRODE FOR ALL-SOLID-STATE BATTERY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Sung-Ju LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Ho-Suk LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
WOO, Seung-He LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
KANG, Sung-Joong LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
HAN, Hyea-Eun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/50] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2019/30] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18802182.8 | 15.05.2018 | [2019/30] | WO2018KR05569 | Priority number, date | KR20170060064 | 15.05.2017 Original published format: KR 20170060064 | [2019/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018212567 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3514862 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3514862 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/139, H01M4/04, H01M4/62, H01M4/13, H01M10/0562, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M10/0565, // H01M4/131, H01M4/1391 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
H01M4/0409 (EP);
H01M4/139 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/0471 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M4/04 (EP,US);
H01M4/0416 (KR);
H01M4/0435 (KR);
H01M4/045 (US);
H01M4/13 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (EP);
H01M4/525 (EP);
H01M4/62 (KR,US);
H01M4/621 (KR);
H01M2300/0068 (KR);
H01M2300/0082 (US);
H01M4/131 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/30] | H01M4/139, H01M4/04, H01M4/62, H01M4/13, H01M10/0562 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODE FÜR FESTKÖRPERBATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/30] | English: | ELECTRODE FOR ALL-SOLID-STATE BATTERY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2019/30] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POUR BATTERIE ENTIÈREMENT SOLIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2019 | Translation filed | 16.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 11.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | IT | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1961060 (INFINITE POWER SOLUTIONS INC [US]); | [A]JP2010262764 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [XAI]KR101728828B ; | [E]WO2018160498 (LYTEN INC [US]) | International search | [A]KR20070034104 ; | [Y]JP2010262764 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]KR20140017105 (KOREA ELECTROTECH RES INST [KR]); | [A]KR20140137362 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [Y]KR101728828B |