EP3626691 - MATERIAL FOR MOLDING, FUNCTIONAL AGENT, MOLDED PRODUCT, AND PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Ceramics Co., Ltd. 4-1-23, Shiba Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOIE Shohachi c/o KOMATSU IGATA SEISAKUSHO INC. He-39-1 Yatashinmachi Komatsu-shi Ishikawa 923-0976 / JP | 02 /
INOIE Hiroshi c/o KOMATSU IGATA SEISAKUSHO INC. He-39-1 Yatashinmachi Komatsu-shi Ishikawa 923-0976 / JP | 03 /
INOIE Miki c/o KOMATSU IGATA SEISAKUSHO INC. He-39-1 Yatashinmachi Komatsu-shi Ishikawa 923-0976 / JP | 04 /
USHIMARU Yukihiro c/o AGC CERAMICS CO. LTD. 6-1 Umei 5-chome Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8655 / JP | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18802544.9 | 17.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018JP19205 | Priority number, date | JP20170099883 | 19.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017099883 | [2020/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018212310 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626691 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/06, B22C1/10, B28B1/30, C04B22/10, C04B28/02, C04B28/04, C04B28/26, C04B28/34, B22C1/18 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
C04B28/04 (EP);
B22C9/02 (US);
B22C1/181 (EP,US);
B28B1/30 (EP);
C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B28/06 (EP);
C04B28/105 (US);
C04B28/26 (EP);
C04B28/34 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/303, C04B14/304, C04B14/306, C04B18/146, C04B20/008, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/14, C04B2103/465, C04B2103/50 (EP);
C04B28/06, C04B14/303, C04B14/306, C04B22/10, C04B24/2623, C04B40/0608 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/13] | C04B28/06, B22C1/10, B28B1/30, C04B14/02, C04B22/06, C04B22/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | MATERIAL ZUM FORMEN, FUNKTIONALER WIRKSTOFF, FORMPRODUKT UND PRODUKT | [2020/13] | English: | MATERIAL FOR MOLDING, FUNCTIONAL AGENT, MOLDED PRODUCT, AND PRODUCT | [2020/13] | French: | MATÉRIAU POUR MOULAGE, AGENT FONCTIONNEL, ARTICLE FABRIQUÉ PAR MOULAGE, ET ARTICLE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2019 | Translation filed | 14.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 25.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63193830 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2006247743 (KAO CORP); | [Y]JP2010110802 (KOMATSU IGATA SEISAKUSHO KK, et al); | [Y]JP2013053059 (AGC CERAMICS CO LTD); | [XY]WO2013054833 (KOMATSU IGATA SEISAKUSHO INC [JP], et al); | [XY]JP2016117069 (TAKATORI SEISAKUSHO:KK, et al) | by applicant | JP2002528375 | JP2017099883 |