EP3624733 - DEVICES AND METHODS OF COMMISSURE FORMATION FOR PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Lifesciences Corporation One Edwards Way Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUROVICH, Nikolay Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | 02 /
BUKIN, Michael Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | 03 /
TSYPENYUK, Alexey M. Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | 04 /
SHERMAN, Elena Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | 05 /
KERSH, Dikla Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | 06 /
MANASH, Boaz Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | 07 /
TAYEB, Liron Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | 08 /
YOHANAN, Ziv Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | 09 /
BARASH, Alexander Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | 10 /
NEUMANN, Yair, A. Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | 11 /
SAAR, Tomer Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine CA 92614 / US | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18802855.9 | 15.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018US32729 | Priority number, date | US201762506430P | 15.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762506430 P | US201862614299P | 05.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862614299 P | US201815978459 | 14.05.2018 Original published format: US201815978459 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018213284 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624733 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0091 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0069 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMISSURFORMUNG FÜR HERZKLAPPENPROTHESE | [2020/13] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS OF COMMISSURE FORMATION FOR PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE | [2020/13] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION DE COMMISSURE POUR VALVE CARDIAQUE PROTHÉTIQUE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 11.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012089223 (NGUYEN SON V [US], et al); | [XI]EP2816980 (SYNTHEON CARDIOLOGY LLC [US]) | International search | [A]US2005228494 (MARQUEZ SALVADOR [US]); | [A]US2013023984 (CONKLIN BRIAN S [US]); | [A]US2013150956 (YOHANAN ZIV [IL], et al); | [A]WO2014100476 (GORE & ASS [US]); | [A]US9011527 (LI XUEMEI [US], et al) | by applicant | US5411522 | US6730118 | US2012089223 | US2012123529 | US2012239142 | US2018028310 | US2018153689 |