EP3624936 - POROUS BODIES WITH ENHANCED CRUSH STRENGTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scientific Design LLC 49 Industrial Avenue Little Ferry NJ 07643 / US | [2024/36] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states Scientific Design Company, Inc. 49 Industrial Avenue Little Ferry, New Jersey 07643 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUCHANEK, Wojciech L. 494 Vance Avenue Wyckoff New Jersey 07481 / US | 02 /
DIMARE, Michael c/o Scientific Design Company Inc. 49 Industrial Avenue Little Ferry New Jersey 07643 / US | 03 /
ADAM, Jean c/o Scientific Design Company Inc. 49 Industrial Avenue Little Ferry New Jersey 07643 / US | 04 /
ELLIS, Paul E. Jr. c/o Scientific Design Company Inc. 49 Industrial Avenue Little Ferry New Jersey 07643 / US | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18803162.9 | 15.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018US32630 | Priority number, date | US201762506328P | 15.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762506328 P | US201715834375 | 07.12.2017 Original published format: US201715834375 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018213218 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3624936 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/04, B01J35/10, B01J35/00, B01J23/50, B01J23/36, B01J23/04 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
B01J23/688 (EP,US);
B01D53/22 (US);
B01D53/86 (US);
B01D63/066 (EP,US);
B01D69/108 (EP,US);
B01D71/0221 (EP,US);
B01D71/0223 (EP,US);
B01D71/025 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (EP,US);
B01J21/12 (US);
B01J23/50 (EP,US);
B01J23/66 (US);
B01J23/8986 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J35/50 (EP,US);
B01J35/612 (EP,US);
B01J35/613 (US);
B01J35/633 (EP,US);
B01J35/635 (EP,US);
B01J35/638 (EP,US);
B01J35/657 (US);
B01J35/66 (EP,US);
C07D301/10 (EP,US);
B01D2255/104 (US);
B01J37/0018 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | PORÖSE KÖRPER MIT VERBESSERTER BRUCHFESTIGKEIT | [2020/13] | English: | POROUS BODIES WITH ENHANCED CRUSH STRENGTH | [2020/13] | French: | CORPS POREUX AYANT UNE RÉSISTANCE À L'ÉCRASEMENT AMÉLIORÉE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 15.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004014549 (COMBS GLENN A [US]); | [Y]US2015343433 (DOBNER CORNELIA KATHARINA [DE], et al); | [YD]US2016354760 (SUCHANEK WOJCIECH L [US]) | International search | [A]WO2010008919 (SCIENT DESIGN CO [US], et al); | [A]US2010056816 (WALLIN STEN A [US], et al); | [A]US2012065055 (JIANG JUN [CN], et al); | [Y]US2015343433 (DOBNER CORNELIA KATHARINA [DE], et al); | [Y]US2016354760 (SUCHANEK WOJCIECH L [US]) |