EP3650929 - ARRAY SUBSTRATE AND DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Chongqing Boe Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No.7 Yunhan Rd. Shuitu Hi-tech Industrial Zone Beibei District Chongqing 400714 / CN | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Zhihui No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Shuai No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas Fritzsche Patent Naupliastraße 110 81545 München / DE | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18803309.6 | 01.03.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018CN77736 | Priority number, date | CN201720796035U | 03.07.2017 Original published format: CN 201720796035 U | [2020/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019007087 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650929 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1345, G09G3/20, G09F9/00 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
G02F1/1345 (EP);
G09F9/00 (EP);
G09G2300/0426 (EP);
G09G2310/0205 (EP);
G09G2310/0221 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Title | German: | ARRAY-SUBSTRAT UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/20] | English: | ARRAY SUBSTRATE AND DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2020/20] | French: | SUBSTRAT MATRICIEL ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2019 | Translation filed | 27.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 30.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CN102855861 (SHENZHEN HUAXING OPTOELECT TEC) [X] 1 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046]; figures 3, 4 * [Y] 8,10,11 [I] 2-7,9,12,13; | [XYI]US2005286004 (LEE YOUNG H [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0051]; figures 3-5 * [Y] 8,10,11 [I] 2-7,9,12,13; | [IY]CN106205540 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT) [I] 1-7,9,12,13 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-4, 5a, 5b * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0011]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 8,10,11; | US2018224700 [ ] (YUE SHOUZHEN [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0011]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-4, 5a, 5b * | International search | [X]US2005286004 (LEE YOUNG H [KR]) [X] 1-13; | [A]CN102682694 (SHENZHEN HUAXING OPTOELECT TEC)[A] 1-13; | [X]CN102855861 (SHENZHEN HUAXING OPTOELECT TEC) [X] 1-13; | [PX]CN206848661U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-13 |