EP3704845 - AUTO DISCOVERY OF NETWORK PROXIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NATARAJ, Harish 717 Hilldale Avenue Berkeley CA 94708 / US | 02 /
CHANDEL, Ajay 923 Boar Circle Fremont CA 94539 / US | 03 /
SAXENA, Nikhar, Rakesh 3198 Maguire Way Dublin CA 94568 / US | 04 /
KONDAPALLI, Naveen 233 Snowdrop Court San Ramon CA 94582 / US | 05 /
KALIGOTLA, Prakash 3245 Charmat Court San Jose CA 95135 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18803502.6 | 22.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018US56855 | Priority number, date | US201715800055 | 31.10.2017 Original published format: US201715800055 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019089256 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3704845 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/26, H04L29/12, H04L29/08 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
H04L41/12 (EP,US);
H04L43/026 (EP,US);
H04L43/028 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US);
H04L61/2514 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE ENTDECKUNG VON NETZWERKPROXYS | [2020/37] | English: | AUTO DISCOVERY OF NETWORK PROXIES | [2020/37] | French: | DÉCOUVERTE AUTOMATIQUE DE MANDATAIRES DE RÉSEAU | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 12.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 13.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1130850 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [Y] 5-7,13-15,17-20,23 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * [A] 1-4,8-12,16,21,22,24,25; | [A]EP2232810 (SCANSAFE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] ** paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0037] *; | [XA]WO2014001773 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,9,10,21,25 * abstract * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 22 * * page 5, line 20 - page 9, line 16 * * page 2, line 1 - line 17 * [A] 3-8,11-20,22-24; | [XYI]US9379952 (LI LI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,16,21,22,24,25 * abstract * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 30 * * column 10, line 40 - column 10, line 50 * * column 12, line 20 - column 15, line 15 * [Y] 5-7,13-15,17-20,23 [I] 3,4,11,12; | [A]US2017222893 (NATARAJ HARISH [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * |