02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
20.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
07.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
07.06.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
30.06.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
23.06.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.06.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.06.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.02.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] |
18.12.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] |
30.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
24.07.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
24.07.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
24.07.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
13.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
11.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
27.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|