EP3710234 - DEVICE FOR THERMALLY WELDING PLASTIC PARTS, AND ASSEMBLY CONTAINING A DEVICE OF THIS KIND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barkhoff, Roland T6/4 68161 Mannheim / DE | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Kesselhut, Wolf Reble & Kesselhut PartG mbB Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2023/32] |
Former [2020/39] | Kesselhut, Wolf Reble & Klose Rechts- und Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 18803919.2 | 12.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018EP80896 | Priority number, date | DE20171010550 | 14.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017010550 | [2020/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019096725 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710234 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3710234 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/14, B29C65/10, B29C65/72, B29C65/78, B29K101/12 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
B29C66/00141 (EP,US);
B29C65/103 (EP,US);
B29C65/1412 (EP,US);
B29C65/1432 (EP,US);
B29C65/1467 (EP,US);
B29C65/72 (EP,US);
B29C65/7802 (EP,US);
B29C65/7841 (EP,US);
B29C66/1142 (EP,US);
B29C66/1312 (EP);
B29C66/5221 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/80 (EP);
B29C66/8242 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM THERMISCHEN VERSCHWEISSEN VON KUNSTSTOFFTEILEN SOWIE ANORDNUNG ENTHALTEND EINE SOLCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR THERMALLY WELDING PLASTIC PARTS, AND ASSEMBLY CONTAINING A DEVICE OF THIS KIND | [2020/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ AU SOUDAGE THERMIQUE DE PIÈCES EN PLASTIQUE AINSI QU'AGENCEMENT COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 15.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | LU | 12.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
LU | 12.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10019300 (SCHULZ HANS GEORG [DE]) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0011]; figure 2 *; | [AD]EP1415789 (SCHULZ HANS GEORG [DE]) [AD] 1,15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102007026163 (BIELOMATIK LEUZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,15 * figure 2 *; | [A]CN102935719B (NINGBO SHENTONG MOULD & PLASTIC CO LTD) [A] 1,15* figure - * | by applicant | EP1415789 |