EP3710701 - A MODULE FOR A VACUUM PUMPING AND/OR ABATEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill, Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEO, Hammond Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | 02 /
SHAW, Helen Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | 03 /
SANDS, Craig Leonard Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Arnold, Emily Anne Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill, West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18804077.8 | 09.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018GB53244 | Priority number, date | GB20170018752 | 13.11.2017 Original published format: GB 201718752 | GB20180004937 | 27.03.2018 Original published format: GB 201804937 | GB20180008946 | 31.05.2018 Original published format: GB 201808946 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019092430 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710701 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3710701 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04B37/14, F04B41/00, F04C25/02, C23C14/00, F04C23/00, F04B39/14, C23C16/44 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
F04B39/121 (EP,KR,US);
F04B37/14 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/4412 (GB,KR,US);
C23C14/564 (KR);
C23C16/44 (EP);
F04B39/123 (EP,KR,US);
F04B39/14 (EP,GB,KR,US);
F04B41/00 (EP,KR,US);
F04C23/00 (US);
F04C23/001 (EP,KR);
F04C25/02 (EP,KR,US);
F04C29/00 (GB);
F04D25/16 (GB,KR);
F16B5/0233 (EP,KR);
F16L23/00 (GB,KR);
F16L23/06 (EP);
F16L23/08 (US);
F16L25/12 (GB);
F16L27/08 (GB,KR);
F16L51/04 (EP,KR,US);
F16L53/35 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODUL FÜR EIN VAKUUMPUMP- UND/ODER ABSAUGSYSTEM | [2020/39] | English: | A MODULE FOR A VACUUM PUMPING AND/OR ABATEMENT SYSTEM | [2020/39] | French: | MODULE POUR SYSTÈME DE POMPAGE ET/OU DE RÉDUCTION SOUS VIDE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 26.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Request for further processing for: | 12.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | LU | 09.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
LU | 09.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1085206 (ZUCHT MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10316129 (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XA]US7824500 (SARVER ROGER [US]) [X] 1-7,10-15 * column 1, lines 44-62 * [A] 8,9; | [XA]EP2815800 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044]; figures 3,4 * [A] 8,9; | [A]DE202015005199U (VACUUBRAND GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0044] - [0062]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102015121905 (MEHRER COMPRESSION GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE102016108141 (CONNECT COM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0142] - [0149] * |