EP3705553 - PROCESS AND REACTOR FOR CONTINUOUS CHARCOAL PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vallourec Tubos Do Brasil S.A. Av. Olinto Meireles, 65 Barreiro de Baixo 30640-010 Belo Horizonte, MG / BR | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LATORRE, Fernando Rua Honduras 78 Bairro Leo Batista 35790-000 Curvelo - MG / BR | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18804222.0 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018BR50362 | Priority number, date | BR20171021185 | 02.10.2017 Original published format: BR102017021185 | [2020/37] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068159 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | PT | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705553 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C10B1/04, C10B49/02, C10B53/02 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
C10B53/02 (EP,BR,US);
C10B17/00 (BR,US);
C10B1/04 (EP,US);
C10B21/18 (BR,US);
C10B21/22 (BR,US);
C10B31/02 (BR,US);
C10B33/12 (BR);
C10B41/08 (BR,US);
C10B47/16 (BR);
C10B49/02 (EP);
C10B49/04 (BR,US);
C10B57/10 (US);
Y02E50/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND REAKTOR ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HOLZKOHLEHERSTELLUNG | [2020/37] | English: | PROCESS AND REACTOR FOR CONTINUOUS CHARCOAL PRODUCTION | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET RÉACTEUR POUR LA PRODUCTION CONTINUE DE CHARBON DE BOIS | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2020 | Translation filed | 04.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 04.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR872551 (MM. MOÏSE PEAUDECERF AND PAUL LASSALLE) [Y] 5-13* figure 1 *; | [Y]US2289917 (A. LAMBIOTTE) [Y] 1-11 * figure 1 * * claims 1,2 * * page 1, line 11 - page 2, line 70 *; | [XYI]US4419185 (BOWEN MACK D [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * * claims 1-27 * * column 12, line 62 - column 14, line 29 * [Y] 1-13 [I] 4; | [Y]WO2009094736 (V & M DO BRASIL S A [BR], et al) [Y] 12,13 * figures 2a,2b * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 27 * |