EP3716814 - ANGLE-ADJUSTABLE BRACKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG Klaus-Fischer-Strasse 1 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSANKE, Timo Carl-Zeiss-Str. 2 72202 Nagold / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18804609.8 | 16.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018EP81643 | Priority number, date | DE201710128322 | 29.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017128322 | [2020/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019105772 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3716814 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/07, A47B57/04 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
A47B96/07 (EP);
F16B2/065 (EP);
F16B9/058 (EP);
F16L3/16 (EP);
H02G3/263 (EP);
A47B57/045 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | WINKELVERSTELLBARE KONSOLE | [2020/41] | English: | ANGLE-ADJUSTABLE BRACKET | [2020/41] | French: | CONSOLE RÉGLABLE ANGULAIREMENT | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 23.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3550891 (SCOTT CHARLES F) [X] 1,2,6 * figures 1-4 * [I] 5; | [X]JPS6421638U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,2,6,8,10 * figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US5117986 (LIN HSIN-HSIUNG [TW]) [X] 1,2,6,8,10 * figures 3,4,6 * [I] 11; | [X]GB2297896 (ARTFORM INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE7306928U |