EP3630011 - DEPTH OF FOCUS AND VISUAL ACUITY USING COLORIZED APODIZATION OF INTRA-OCULAR LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RxSight, Inc. 100 Columbia Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLER, Matt 2729 Starbird Drive Costa Mesa CA 92626 / US | 02 /
SANDSTEDT, Christian, A. 500 East Del Mar Blvd Unit 21 Pasadena CA 91101 / US | 03 /
GRUBBS, Robert, H. 1700Spruce Street South Pasadena CA 91030 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18805034.8 | 22.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US33980 | Priority number, date | US201715600792 | 22.05.2017 Original published format: US201715600792 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018217822 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3630011 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16, A61F2/14, G02C7/04, G02C7/06 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A61F2/1659 (EP,US);
A61F2/1624 (US);
B29D11/023 (EP,US);
G02B27/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2/1613 (EP,US);
A61F2002/1681 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOKUSTIEFE UND SEHSCHÄRFE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER FARBIGEN APODISIERUNG VON INTRAOKULARLINSEN | [2020/15] | English: | DEPTH OF FOCUS AND VISUAL ACUITY USING COLORIZED APODIZATION OF INTRA-OCULAR LENSES | [2020/15] | French: | PROFONDEUR DE FOYER ET ACUITÉ VISUELLE À L'AIDE D'UNE APODISATION COLORISÉE DE LENTILLES INTRA-OCULAIRES | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 16.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US7341599 (PEYMAN GHOLAM A [US]) [A] 1-26* entire document *; | [A]US2011098811 (HONG XIN [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [XY]US8500805 (KOBAYASHI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4, 8 * entire document * [Y] 6, 7, 9, 11-13, 16-20, 22, 23, 26; | [A]US2014268034 (WOOLEY C BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016339657 (GRUBBS ROBERT H [US], et al) [Y] 6, 7, 9, 11-13, 16-20, 22, 23, 26 * entire document * |