EP3631385 - TRAIN LOAD-OUT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Der-Chang John Lee ATF Ikhthus Trust 34 Jasmine Loop Willetton, Western Australia 6155 / AU | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Der-Chang John 34 Jasmine Loop Willetton, Western Australia 6155 / AU | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Butler, Kathryn Louise, et al Sirius IP Festival House Jessop Avenue Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3SH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Maidment, Marc, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18805304.5 | 16.04.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018AU50341 | Priority number, date | AU20170902013 | 26.05.2017 Original published format: AU 2017902013 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018213869 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3631385 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/04, B65G67/22, G01G13/06 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
B65G67/22 (EP);
B65G65/005 (US);
B65G3/04 (US);
B65G67/04 (US);
G01G13/024 (US);
G01G13/06 (US);
G01G13/28 (US);
G01G13/2853 (US);
G01G13/2952 (US);
G01G19/04 (EP,US);
G01G19/045 (US);
B65G2201/045 (US);
B65G2814/0302 (US);
B65G2814/0323 (US);
B65G2814/0344 (US);
B65G2814/0347 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | AUSLADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR ZUG | [2020/15] | English: | TRAIN LOAD-OUT ARRANGEMENT | [2020/15] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE CHARGEMENT DE TRAIN | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 25.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 07.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 23.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.05.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2021 | 30.04.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4629392 (CAMPBELL JOHN A L [US], et al) [A] 1* column 16, line 15 - line 45; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4659274 (FRANCE RODNEY C [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 38; figures 1-5 *; | [A]AU2016200664 (SANDPIT INNOVATION PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0040] - [0051]; figure 1 * | International search | [XY]US4659274 (FRANCE RODNEY C [US]) [X] 1, 7-20, 22-31, 33-35 * Abstract, Figures 1-8, column 4 line 30 to column 6 line 53 Abstract, Figs 1-8, column 5 lines 20-56 * [Y] 2-6, 21, 32; | [XY]AU2014289638B (SCHENCK PROCESS EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1, 7-20, 22-31, 33-35 * Abstract, Figures 1-3, pages 4 second paragraph, page 6 last three paragraphs, pages 9-12 Abstract, Figures 1-2 * [Y] 2-6, 21, 32; | [XY]US4904154 (CAMPBELL JOHN A L [US], et al) [X] 1, 7-20, 22-31, 33-35 * Abstract, Figure 1, column 3 lines 6-65, column 4 line 48 to column 6 line 62 column 4 line 48 to column 5 line 10 * [Y] 2-6, 21, 32; | [Y]US2013220710 (RETTIG MANFRED [DE], et al) [Y] 2-6, 21, 32 * Abstract, Figures 1-11 and accompany description, paragraphs [0051], [0064]-[0065] * |