EP3629972 - EVENT INITIATED RELEASE OF FUNCTION SELECTION CONTROL FOR ROBOTIC SURGICAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASSIK, Renen 518 Lowell Street Lexington, Massachusetts 02420 / US | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | 01 /
BASSIK, Renen 1443 Beacon Street Brookline, Massachusetts 02446 / US | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | Application number, filing date | 18805631.1 | 17.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US33097 | Priority number, date | US201762510802P | 25.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762510802 P | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018217527 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3629972 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/00, A61B34/35, A61B34/37, A61B17/00, // A61B18/00, A61B90/00 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
A61B34/37 (EP,US);
A61B34/74 (US);
A61B18/12 (US);
A61B34/25 (EP,US);
A61B34/70 (EP);
A61B2017/00017 (EP);
A61B2017/00115 (EP);
A61B2017/00393 (EP);
A61B2017/00973 (EP);
A61B2018/00601 (US);
A61B2018/0063 (US);
A61B2018/00952 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | A61B34/00, A61B34/35, A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | EREIGNISINITIIERTE FREIGABE EINER FUNKTIONSAUSWAHLSTEUERUNG FÜR ROBOTISCHE CHIRURGISCHE SYSTEME | [2020/15] | English: | EVENT INITIATED RELEASE OF FUNCTION SELECTION CONTROL FOR ROBOTIC SURGICAL SYSTEMS | [2020/15] | French: | COMMANDE DE LIBÉRATION DE SÉLECTION DE FONCTION INITIÉE PAR UN ÉVÉNEMENT POUR SYSTÈMES CHIRURGICAUX ROBOTIQUES | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 02.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2022416 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0078] * * figure 8 * [A] 13,14; | [X]US2010198402 (GREER ALEXANDER [CA], et al) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0034] , [0053] , [0065] * * figure 1B *; | [Y]WO2013134133 (MEDTRONIC ARDIAN LUXEMBOURG SARL [LU], et al) [Y] 15* paragraph [0086] *; | [XY]US2013304066 (KERR DUANE E [US], et al) [X] 11-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0041] , [0054] , [0068] * * figures 1A,10 * [Y] 15; | [XA]US2016074101 (ANGLESE KURT J [US], et al) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0105] , [0116] * * figure 1 * [A] 13; | [X]GB2532069 (PAUL WEATHERSTONE [GB]) [X] 11 * page 1, line 3 - line 4 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US2007102473 (SHELTON FREDERICK E IV [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See the whole document. *; | [A]US2009030428 (OMORI SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * See the whole document. *; | [YA]US2013304066 (KERR DUANE E [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * See claims 10-20; paragraphs [0063]-[0066]; figures 4-10. * [A] 6-20; | [Y]US2014005682 (WORRELL BARRY C [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * See claims 1-18; figures 1 and 63. *; | [A]US2015173849 (ROBINSON DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See the whole document. * |