EP3632997 - OIL-BASED INK COMPOSITION FOR WRITING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pencil Company, Limited 23-37, Higashiohi 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8537 / JP | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARUHARA, Yumiko c/o Yokohama Office MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY LIMITED 5-12 Irie 2-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8550 / JP | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2023/37] |
Former [2020/15] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18806468.7 | 09.03.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018JP09316 | Priority number, date | JP20170100995 | 22.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017100995 | [2020/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018216315 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632997 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3632997 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/16, C09D11/18, B43K1/12, B43K8/02 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
C09D11/18 (EP);
C09D11/16 (EP,US);
B43K1/12 (EP);
B43K8/02 (EP);
B43K8/03 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | C09D11/16, B43K1/12, B43K8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF ÖLBASIS FÜR EIN SCHREIBGERÄT | [2020/15] | English: | OIL-BASED INK COMPOSITION FOR WRITING INSTRUMENT | [2020/15] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENCRE À BASE D'HUILE DESTINÉE À UN INSTRUMENT D'ÉCRITURE | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2019 | Translation filed | 20.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 11.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 13.12.2023 | |
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003041776 (SPENCER JEAN L [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0050]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2006063856 (CORDOVA ABIMAEL [US]) [X] 1-4* paragraph [0029]; example - *; | [X]JP2006124456 (PILOT INK CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0023]; example -; claim - * | International search | [X]JP2008208290 (PILOT INK CO LTD) [X] 4-5 * , *; | [A]JP2008208292 (PILOT INK CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [A]JP2012240916 (KAO CORP, et al) [A] 1-5* , *; | [X]JP2013095846 (PENTEL KK) [X] 1-3, 5 * . * | by applicant | JP2008208292 |