EP3629980 - ROBOTIC SURGICAL SYSTEM WITH AUTOMATED GUIDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOWANIEC, Matthew 35 Blueberry Hill Drive Madison, Connecticut 06443 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Xingrui 36 Meadowrue Drive Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18806526.2 | 07.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US31302 | Priority number, date | US201762510938P | 25.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762510938 P | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018217431 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3629980 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/32, A61B34/00, A61B34/20, A61B17/00, // A61B34/30, A61B90/00 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
A61B34/32 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP);
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP);
A61B2034/301 (EP,US);
A61B2034/302 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | A61B34/32, A61B34/00, A61B34/20, A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | ROBOTISCHES CHIRURGISCHES SYSTEM MIT AUTOMATISCHER FÜHRUNG | [2020/15] | English: | ROBOTIC SURGICAL SYSTEM WITH AUTOMATED GUIDANCE | [2020/15] | French: | SYSTÈME CHIRURGICAL ROBOTIQUE À GUIDAGE AUTOMATISÉ | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 09.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/08] | 29.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03041057 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *; | [IY]DE102010029275 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-4,6-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0035] , [0037] - [0042] * * figure 1 * * claims 1,2,4 * [Y] 5; | [Y]WO2016029289 (SYNAPTIVE MEDICAL BARBADOS INC [BB], et al) [Y] 5 * claim 8 *; | [A]US2016235493 (LEBOEUF II ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2-5,8 *; | [A] - WEISS L ET AL, "Dynamic sensor-based control of robots with visual feedback", IEEE JOURNAL ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, IEEE, USA, (19871001), vol. 3, no. 5, doi:10.1109/JRA.1987.1087115, ISSN 0882-4967, pages 404 - 417, XP011217419 [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 36 - line 41 * * figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JRA.1987.1087115 | International search | [A]WO2007088206 (EURATOM [BE], et al) [A] 1-19* See the whole document. *; | [A]US2010241079 (ABRAMS MICHAEL E [US]) [A] 1-19 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2013066335 (BAERWINKEL RONNY [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0051]; claims 11-20; figures 1, 2. *; | [A]US2014276007 (SELA GAL [CA], et al) [A] 1-19 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2017007349 (SOLAR MATTHEW S [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * See the whole document. * |