EP3709988 - ASSOCIATION OF ACTIVES FOR TREATING PROSTATE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Régional du Cancer de Montpellier (ICM) 208 Rue des Apothicaires 34090 Montpellier / FR | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université de Montpellier 163, rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | For all designated states Institut Regional du Cancer de Montpellier (ICM) 208 Rue des Apothicaires 34090 Montpellier / FR | ||
For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Université de Montpellier 163, rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONGORA, Céline IRCM U1194 208 rue des Apothicaires 34298 Montpellier / FR | 02 /
TOSI, Diego ICM 208 rue des Apothicaires 34298 Montpellier / FR | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18807022.1 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018EP81190 | Priority number, date | EP20170306576 | 14.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17306576 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019096824 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709988 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/167, A61K31/277, A61K31/416, A61K31/4166, A61K31/4188, A61K31/437, A61K31/496, A61K31/5025, A61K31/58, A61P35/00 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/4166 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/167 (EP);
A61K31/277 (EP);
A61K31/4155 (US);
A61K31/416 (EP,KR);
A61K31/4188 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (KR,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,KR);
A61K31/5025 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/277, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4166, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/416, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4188, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5025, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | ASSOZIIERUNG VON WIRKSTOFFEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PROSTATAKREBS | [2020/39] | English: | ASSOCIATION OF ACTIVES FOR TREATING PROSTATE CANCER | [2020/39] | French: | ASSOCIATION D'ACTIFS POUR TRAITER LE CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 15.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015065919 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-19 * claims 1,18-21, *; | [XI]US2015209359 (YAFFE MICHAEL B [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,10 * example 9; claim 5 * [I] 2,8,11-19; | [XDI]WO2017117182 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [XD] 1,4,7 * paragraphs [0054] , [0245]; claims 5,16-18 * [I] 3,12-19; | [A] - EMMANUEL S. ANTONARAKIS ET AL, "AR-V7 and Resistance to Enzalutamide and Abiraterone in Prostate Cancer", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20140911), vol. 371, no. 11, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1315815, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1028 - 1038, XP055203484 [A] 1-19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1315815 | [A] - L KHANDRIKA ET AL, "Hypoxia-associated p38 mitogen-activated protein kinase-mediated androgen receptor activation and increased HIF-1[alpha] levels contribute to emergence of an aggressive phenotype in prostate cancer", ONCOGENE, (20090119), vol. 28, no. 9, doi:10.1038/onc.2008.476, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 1248 - 1260, XP055440745 [A] 1-19 * page 1253, column 1, paragraphs 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2008.476 | by applicant | US2015209359 | WO2017117182 | - EMMANUEL S.ANTONARAKIS, "AR-V7 and resistance to enzalutamide and abiraterone in prostate cancer", N England J Med, (20140911), vol. 371, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1315815, pages 1028 - 1038, XP055203484 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1315815 | - KHANDRIKA L et al., "Hypoxia-associated p38 mitogen-activated protein kinase-mediated androgen receptor activation and increased HIF-la levels contribute to emergence of an aggressive phenotype in prostate cancer", Oncogene, (20090000), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1038/onc.2008.476, pages 1248 - 1260, XP055440745 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2008.476 | - GAN et al., The Prostate, Wiley-Liss, Inc., (20110000), vol. 71, pages 1158 - 1166 | - AN PARANJAPE et al., "Inhibition of FOXC2 restores epithelial phenotype and drug sensitivity in prostate cancers with stem-cell properties", Oncogene, (20160000), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1038/onc.2015.498, pages 5963 - 5976, XP055440747 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2015.498 | - ANTONARAKIS et al., "Clinical Significance of Androgen Receptor Splice Variant-7 mRNA Detection in Circulating Tumor Cells of Men With Metastatic Castration-Resistant Prostate Cancer Treated With First- and Second-Line Abiraterone and Enzalutamide", Prostate Cancer Prostatic Disease, (20170701), vol. 35, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1200/JCO.2016.70.1961, XP009502836 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2016.70.1961 | - ANTONARAKIS et al., "Clinical Significance of Androgen Receptor Splice Variant-7 mRNA Detection in Circulating Tumor Cells of Men With Metastatic Castration-Resistant Prostate Cancer Treated With First- and Second-Line Abiraterone and Enzalutamide", Prostate Cancer Prostatic disease, (20170701), vol. 35, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1200/JCO.2016.70.1961, XP009502836 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2016.70.1961 | - SCHER et al., JAMA Oncol., (20160000), vol. 2, no. ll, pages 1441 - 1449 | - LEHAR, J.; KRUEGER, A.S.; AVERY, W.; HEILBUT, A.M.; JOHANSEN, L.M.; PRICE, E.R.; RICKLES, R.J.; SHORT, G.F.; STAUNTON, J.E.; JIN,, "Synergistic drug combinations tend to improve therapeutically relevant selectivity", Nat. Biotechnol., (20090000), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt.1549, pages 659 - 666, XP055447444 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1549 |