EP3714440 - ZUTRITTSKONTROLLVORRICHTUNG FÜR PERSONEN MITTELS 2D ODER 3D GESICHTSERKENNUNG NACH VORANGEGANGENER 3D AUFNAHME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/40] | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE ACCESS OF AN INDIVIDUAL BY 2D OR 3D RECOGNITION OF AN INDIVIDUAL'S FACE FROM THE PRIOR 3D ACQUISITION OF SAME | ||
[2022/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Photo-Me International PLC 3B Blenheim Road Longmead Industrial Estate Epsom, Surrey KT19 9AP / GB | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROLL, Christian 33 Chemin de Savoyères 38640 Claix / FR | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18807628.5 | 23.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018EP82323 | Priority number, date | FR20170061149 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: FR 1761149 | [2020/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101900 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714440 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714440 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/52, G06V40/16, G07C9/37, // G07C9/15, G07C9/25 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G07C9/37 (EP);
G06V20/52 (EP);
G06V40/172 (EP);
G07C9/15 (EP);
G07C9/25 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | G07C9/00, G06K9/00, G07C9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ACCESS CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH 2D OR 3D FACE RECOGNITION AFTER PRELIMINARY 3D ACQUISITION | [2022/33] | English: | ZUTRITTSKONTROLLVORRICHTUNG FÜR PERSONEN MITTELS 2D ODER 3D GESICHTSERKENNUNG NACH VORANGEGANGENER 3D AUFNAHME | [2022/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE D'ACCES D'UN INDIVIDU PAR RECONNAISSANCE 2D OU 3D DU VISAGE D'UN INDIVIDU A PARTIR DE SON ACQUISITION PREALABLE 3D | [2020/40] |
Former [2020/40] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES ZUGRIFFS EINES PERSON DURCH 2D- ODER 3D-ERKENNUNG DES GESICHTS EINER PERSON AUS DER VORHERIGEN 3D-ERFASSUNG DESSELBEN | ||
Former [2020/40] | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE ACCESS OF AN INDIVIDUAL BY 2D OR 3D RECOGNITION OF AN INDIVIDUAL'S FACE FROM THE PRIOR 3D ACQUISITION OF SAME | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 14.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | IT | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | LU | 23.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005024733 (INTERCARD WIRELESS LTD [AU], et al); | [Y]EP1696393 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [Y]EP2259232 (INCHEON INTERNAT AIRPORT CORP [KR]); | [Y]US2013314908 (MONTEILLIET GILLES [FR], et al); | [Y]DE202014005940U (MAGNETIC AUTOCONTROL GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2016171805 (JANG JAE-SUNG [KR]) |