EP3698588 - AN ESTIMATE OF A LOCATION OF THE TERMINAL DEVICES. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For:AL
Sony Europe Limited The Heights Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
For:AL
Sony Europe Limited The Heights Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Vivek c/o Sony Europe Limited IP Europe Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 02 /
WAKABAYASHI, Hideji c/o Sony Europe Limited IP Europe Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 03 /
WEI, Yuxin c/o Sony Europe Limited IP Europe Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 04 /
TSUDA, Shinichiro c/o Sony Europe Limited IP Europe Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18807905.7 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018EP81365 | Priority number, date | EP20170202193 | 16.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17202193 | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019096901 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698588 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3698588 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W12/037 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHÄTZUNG EINES STANDORTES VON ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNGEN | [2020/35] | English: | AN ESTIMATE OF A LOCATION OF THE TERMINAL DEVICES. | [2020/35] | French: | ESTIMATION D'UNE POSITION DES DISPOSITIFS TERMINAUX | [2023/25] |
Former [2020/35] | ESTIMATION D'UN POSITION DES DISPOSITIFS TERMINAUX | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 02.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | MC | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | LU | 15.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
IT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SK | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
LU | 15.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
LU | 15.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
LU | 15.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013033464 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-25* paragraphs [0070] - [0202]; figures 1-22 * | by applicant | - ROHDE; SCHWARZ, "LTE Location Based Services Technology Introduction", Rohde & Schwarz - White paper, (20130624), URL: http://www.rohde-schwarz-wireless.com/documents/LTELBSWhitePaper RohdeSchwarz.pdf | EP20160180858 | EP20170199204 |