EP3698091 - RECEIVER/DRIER FOR A REFRIGERANT FLUID CIRCUIT EQUIPPING A VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systemes Thermiques Z.A de l'Agiot 8 rue Louis Lormand CS80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZZOUZ, Kamel c/o Valeo Systèmes Thermiques ZA l'Agiot 8 rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | 02 /
MAMMERI, Amrid c/o Valeo Systèmes Thermiques ZA l'Agiot 8 rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Bialkowski, Adam Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Industrial Property Department ZA L'Agiot 8 rue Louis Lormand, CS 80517 LA VERRIERE 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18808359.6 | 28.11.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018EP82898 | Priority number, date | FR20170061247 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: FR 1761247 | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019106049 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698091 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F25B43/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
F25B43/003 (EP,US);
F25B2339/0441 (US);
F25B2400/02 (EP,US);
F25B2400/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | SAMMLER/TROCKNER FÜR EINEN KÄLTEMITTELKREISLAUF ZUR AUSRÜSTUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS, INSBESONDERE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2020/35] | English: | RECEIVER/DRIER FOR A REFRIGERANT FLUID CIRCUIT EQUIPPING A VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2020/35] | French: | RÉCEPTEUR/SÉCHEUR POUR UN CIRCUIT DE FLUIDE FRIGORIGÈNE ÉQUIPANT UN VÉHICULE, EN PARTICULIER UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 20.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | 25.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5619861 (YAMANAKA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 10-12* figure 1 *; | [A]WO9804875 (PARKER HANNIFIN CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2002095948 (CORRIGAN DANIEL LEONARD [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0018] - [0020]; figure - * [Y] 4-8 [I] 10-12; | [A]EP1574796 (HALLA CLIMATE CONTROL CANADA I [CA]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1795753 (VALEO THERMAL SYS JAPAN CO [JP]) [Y] 4-8 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035]; figures 10,11 *; | [A]US2013333402 (STYLES BRYAN M [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 5,6 * |