EP3707200 - ADDITIVE COMPOSITION AND POLYMER COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milliken & Company 920 Milliken Road M-495 Spartanburg, SC 29303 / US | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Chunping 100 East Tianlin Road Apt. 1702 Building 38 Shanghai 200235 / CN | 02 /
LU, Zhenxiao Room 601 Building 66 Lane 258 Shanghai 200237 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Shiliang Room 301 2150 Lianhua Road Shanghai 201103 / CN | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 18808561.7 | 25.10.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018US57452 | Priority number, date | US201762583603P | 09.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762583603 P | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019094201 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3707200 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/1575, C08L23/14 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
C08L23/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/1575 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/0005 (US);
B29C49/04 (KR,US);
C08F210/06 (US);
C08J3/226 (US);
C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (KR);
C08L23/16 (KR);
C08L53/02 (KR);
C08L71/02 (KR);
C08L79/08 (KR);
B29K2101/12 (US);
B29K2105/0005 (US);
C08L2205/025 (US);
C08L2310/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/08, C08L53/02, C08L71/02, C08K5/1575 (US,EP);
C08L23/08, C08L53/02, C08L79/08, C08K5/1575 (US,EP);
C08L23/14, C08L53/02, C08L71/02, C08K5/1575 (EP,US);
C08L23/14, C08L53/02, C08L79/08, C08K5/1575 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | ZUSATZSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT | [2020/38] | English: | ADDITIVE COMPOSITION AND POLYMER COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING THE SAME | [2020/38] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ADDITIF ET COMPOSITIONS DE POLYMÈRE LES COMPRENANT | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 27.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006083640 (MILLIKEN & CO [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 40] , [0 45]; figure 3; examples 1, 6, 7; tables 1, 2 *; | [X]WO2006083642 (MILLIKEN & CO [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * example 3; claim - * *Comparative Examples 1, 3* * paragraphs [0007] , [0 14] , [0 15] , [0 18] , [0 33] *; | [A]WO2010077799 (KRATON POLYMERS US LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-40* example -; claim - *; | [A]JP2013216814 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP) [A] 1-40 * abstract * | by applicant | US3231635 | US3265765 | US3322856 | USRE27145E | US3595942 | US3634549 | US3670054 | US3700633 | US4426495 | US4444953 | US7157510 | US7262236 |