EP3630091 - DOSING SCHEDULE FOR TESETAXEL AND CAPECITABINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Odonate Therapeutics, Inc. 4747 Executive Drive Suite 510 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Thomas 114 W27th Street Apt. PH New York NY 10001 / US | 02 /
TANG, Kevin 6505 Muirlands Drive La Jolla CA 92037 / US | 03 /
KROLL, Stew 660 Santa Ray Avenue Oakland CA 94610 / US | 04 /
LEMKEY, John, G. 5968 Calle Camposeco Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | 05 /
PFEIFFER, Steven 813 Diamond Drive Camarillo CA 93010 / US | 06 /
VACIRCA, Jeff 23 Valentine Road Shoreham NY 11786 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18808779.5 | 01.06.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US35653 | Priority number, date | US201762514483P | 02.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762514483 P | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018223029 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3630091 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 06.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/337, A61K31/7068, A61P35/00 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/4427 (KR);
A61K31/337 (EP,EA,KR);
A61K31/7068 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/443 (US);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | 23.12.2019 | ME | 23.12.2019 | Validation states | MA | 23.12.2019 | MD | 23.12.2019 | TN | 23.12.2019 | Title | German: | DOSIERUNGSSCHEMA FÜR TESETAXEL UND CAPECITABIN | [2020/15] | English: | DOSING SCHEDULE FOR TESETAXEL AND CAPECITABINE | [2020/15] | French: | PROGRAMME DE DOSAGE POUR TÉSÉTAXEL ET CAPÉCITABINE | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 18.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY] - MARTIN MG ET AL, "Phase 1B Study of an All-Oral Chemotherapy Regimen, Tesetaxel Plus Capecitabine, in Patients with Advanced Solid Tumors", ASCO Annual Meeting 2012, (20120604), URL: https://meetinglibrary.asco.org/record/69361/poster, XP055562069 [X] 1-9, 12-15, 18, 19, 23-27, 29-32 * whole document whole document * [Y] 10, 11, 16, 17, 20-22, 28 | [XY] - Muhammad Wasif Saif et al, "Tesetaxel , a new oral taxane, in combination with capecitabine: a phase I, dose-escalation study in patients with advanced solid tumors", Cancer Chemotherapy Pharmacology 2011 Dec, (20110506), vol. 68, no. 6, pages 1565 - 1573, XP019980114 [X] 1-9, 23 * (SAIF MW ET AL) 06 May 2011 (2011/05/06) ab stract ab stract * [Y] 10-22, 24-32 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00280-011-1639-3 | [XY] - John Paul Flores et al, "Novel oral taxane therapies: recent Phase I results", Clinal Investigation (Lond)., (20130400), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 333 - 341, XP055426571 [X] 1-9, 12-15, 18, 19, 23-27, 29-32 * p.337-339 * [Y] 10, 11, 16, 17, 20-22, 28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4155/cli.13.18 | [Y] - AYOU JP ET AL, "Advances in the management of metastatic breast cancer: options beyond first-line chemotherapy", Current Oncology, (20120419), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 91 - 105, XP055562082 [Y] 1-32 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3747/co.19.1024 |