EP3631516 - NON-INVASIVE MEASUREMENT OF ARTERIAL INPUT FUNCTION FOR POSITRON EMISSION TOMOGRAPHY IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Royal Institution for the Advancement of Learning / McGill University 845 Sherbrooke Street West 2nd Floor Montreal, Quebec H3A 0G4 / CA | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGER, Shirin Abbasi Nejad 4701 rue de Brebeuf Montreal. Québec H2J 3L2 / CA | 02 /
KERTZSCHER SCHWENCKE, Gustavo Adolfo Vladimir c/o Maria Kertzscher Gasvagen 12 27433 Skurup / SE | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/15] | 01 /
ENGER, Shirin Abbasi Nejad 4701 rue de Brebeuf Montreal Qu bec H2J 3L2 / CA | ||
02 /
KERTZSCHER SCHWENCKE, Gustavo Adolfo Vladimir c/o Maria Kertzscher Gasvagen 12 27433 Skurup / SE | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18809509.5 | 31.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018CA50644 | Priority number, date | US201762513157P | 31.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762513157 P | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018218361 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3631516 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 06.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29, G01T1/164, G01R33/563 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G01T1/2985 (EP,US);
A61B6/4241 (US);
A61B6/037 (US);
A61B6/507 (US);
G01T1/1603 (EP,US);
G01T1/164 (US);
G01T1/172 (US);
G01T1/201 (US);
G21K1/02 (US);
G01R33/481 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | NICHTINVASIVE MESSUNG DER ARTERIELLEN INPUTFUNKTION FÜR DIE POSITRONENEMISSIONSTOMOGRAPHIE | [2020/15] | English: | NON-INVASIVE MEASUREMENT OF ARTERIAL INPUT FUNCTION FOR POSITRON EMISSION TOMOGRAPHY IMAGING | [2020/15] | French: | MESURE NON INVASIVE DE LA FONCTION D'ENTRÉE ARTÉRIELLE POUR IMAGERIE PAR TOMOGRAPHIE PAR ÉMISSION DE POSITONS | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 08.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0851242 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [X]US2004116807 (AMRAMI RONI [IL], et al); | International search | [Y]US4413184 (MARRONE MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 1, 3-11, 14-20 * Abstract; col. 3,11. 1-5; col. 2,11. 65-68; col. 4,11. 23, 33,47-51; Fig. 5*; | [Y]WO2017010896 (UNIV JAGIELLOŃSKI [PL]) [Y] 1, 3-11, 14-20 * Abstract; p. 1, 4th par, last par.; p. 2, 2nd par., last par ; p. 5, 1st par; p. 8, 1st par.; Fig. 4 *; | [A] - TATSUYA NAKAMURA et al., "Development of position-sensitive scintillation neutron detectors at J PARClMLF", JAEA-Conf 2015 - 002, (20171212), pages 391 - 398, URL: http://www.neutronresearch.com/parch/2014/01/201401003910.pdf, XP055549885 [A] 0 * section "4.2 Scintillator WLSfiber coil detector" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1748-0221/12/12/C12025 | by applicant | EP0851242 | US2004116807 | - CHIE SEKI et al., "Application of a beta microprobe for quantification of regional cerebral blood flow with 0-water and PET in rhesus monkeys", Annals of Nuclear Medicine, (19980000), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 7 - 14, XP055758012 |