EP3631529 - METHOD OF CALCULATING TEMPERATURE AND POROSITY OF GEOLOGICAL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Equinor Energy AS Forusbeen 50 4035 Stavanger / NO | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOKSTAD, Ketil Parkveien 4 7030 Trondheim / NO | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18810217.2 | 01.06.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018NO50145 | Priority number, date | GB20170008748 | 01.06.2017 Original published format: GB 201708748 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018222054 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3631529 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 06.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01V99/00, G01V11/00, G01V1/30, G06F17/11 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G01V11/00 (EP,GB,US);
E21B47/00 (US);
E21B47/07 (US);
E21B49/003 (US);
G01V1/48 (US);
G01V20/00 (US);
G06F17/11 (US);
E21B2200/20 (US);
G01V2210/614 (US);
G01V2210/6169 (US);
G01V2210/6244 (EP,US);
G01V2210/665 (US);
Y02E10/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BERECHNUNG DER TEMPERATUR UND DER POROSITÄT EINER GEOLOGISCHEN STRUKTUR | [2020/15] | English: | METHOD OF CALCULATING TEMPERATURE AND POROSITY OF GEOLOGICAL STRUCTURE | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CALCUL DE TEMPÉRATURE ET DE POROSITÉ DE STRUCTURE GÉOLOGIQUE | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 02.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010185422 (HOVERSTEN GARY MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 2,10,11 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] *; | [XY]WO2015065651 (EXXONMOBIL UPSTREAM RES CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027] * [Y] 2,6,8,10,11,14; | [XY]WO2017074884 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,9,12,13,15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0130] * * claim 19 * [Y] 2,8,10,11,14; | [Y] - Lars Kristensen ET AL, "Pre-drilling assessments ofaverage porosity andpermeability inthe geothermal reservoirs ofthe Danish area", doi:10.1186/s40517-016-0048-6, (20160401), URL: https://geothermal-energy-journal.springeropen.com/articles/10.1186/s40517-016-0048-6, (20210128), XP055769981 [Y] 2,14 * page 3, line 6 - line 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s40517‑016‑0048‑6 | [Y] - STEPHEN A ONACHA ET AL, "HYDROTHERMAL FAULT ZONE MAPPING AT KRAFLA GEOTHERMAL FIELD USING SEISMIC AND ELECTRICAL MEASUREMENTS - Imaging Fractures as Targets for Drilling", (20070401), pages 1 (1) - 111 (137), WPRB /INAGA BALI SEMINAR: WELL TARGETING USING GEOPHYSICAL METHODS: NEW TECHNIQUES FOR EXPLORATION AND MODELLING OF PETER MALIN, INTERNATIONAL GEOTHERMAL ASSOCIATION, BONN, GERMANY, URL: http://www.geothermal-energy.org/pdf/IGAstandard/ISS/2008Bali/Peter_Malin.pdf, (20210128), XP009517909 [Y] 6 * paragraph [02.4] * | International search | [X]WO2014029415 (STATOIL PETROLEUM AS [NO], et al) [X] 1-14, 18 * Abstract; side 5, line 10-12, side 6, line 6-10; claims. *; | [PX]WO2017142422 (STATOIL PETROLEUM AS [NO]) [PX] 1-14, 18 * Entire document. *; | [PX]WO2018106927 (BAKER HUGHES A GE CO LLC [US]) [PX] 1-12, 18* Paragraphs [0002],[0008],[0087]-[0090],[00116]; claims 1,2,9-11,16. *; | [X] - HOKSTAD K et al., "Integrated Basin-scale Thermal Modeling", 76th EAGE Conference & Exhibition, Amsterdam RAI, The Netherlands, (20140616), doi:10.3997/2214-4609.20141132, pages 16 - 19, XP055616149 [X] 1-3, 5-14, 18 * . Entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3997/2214-4609.20141132 | [X] - STEPHEN A et al., "Hydrothermal Fault Zone Mapping at Krafla Geothermal Field Using Seismic and Electrical Measurements", Imaging Fractures as Targets for Drilling, (20070400), vol. 1, no. 111, XP009517909 [X] 1-12, 18 * , Abstract; section 2.2, 2.4.3; figure 7, 11-13, (www.geothermal-energy.org/pdf/IGAstandard/ISS/2008Bali/Peter_Malin.pdf) * | [X] - ADELE MANZELLA, "The Role of Magnetotellurics in Geothermal Exploration,", National Research Council of Italy, (20160000), pages 2 - 15, URL: www.dias.ie/wp-content/uploads/2016/07/Session3_AManzella_Iretherm2016.pdf, XP055562876 [X] 1-12, 14-18 | by applicant | WO2015065651 | WO2017074884 |