EP3631325 - AIR CONDITIONER AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SON, Kil Soo 36 Seonbugwangjangbuk-ro Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15237 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seok Kyun 21-12 Dongtangongwon-ro Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18429 / KR | 03 /
BAEK, Jong-Yeop 243 Gwongwang-ro Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16487 / KR | 04 /
AHN, Byoung-Ok 32 Taejang-ro 82beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16687 / KR | 05 /
CHO, Dong-Ho 246 Gwongwang-ro Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16534 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Hyun Kook 20 Dongtandaerosibeom-gil Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18477 / KR | 07 /
SHIN, Hyo-Jun 232 Yeongtong-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16698 / KR | 08 /
YOO, Sang Ho 60 Daeji-ro 15beon-gil Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16871 / KR | 09 /
JUN, Hong Seok 19 Taejang-ro 71beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16688 / KR | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18810422.8 | 16.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018KR05604 | Priority number, date | KR20170067794 | 31.05.2017 Original published format: KR 20170067794 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018221875 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3631325 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3631325 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02, F25B1/04, F25B41/39, F25B41/00, F25B9/00, F24F11/83, F25B13/00, F25B41/34 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25B1/04 (KR,US);
F25B31/026 (KR,US);
F25B41/34 (EP,KR,US);
F25B41/39 (EP,KR,US);
F25B41/40 (KR);
F25B45/00 (KR,US);
F25B49/02 (EP,KR,US);
F25B9/002 (KR);
F25B2309/004 (KR,US);
F25B2313/005 (EP);
F25B2341/063 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2600/01 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2600/0253 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2600/2513 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2700/171 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2700/2104 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2700/2106 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | F25B49/02, F25B1/04, F25B41/06, F25B41/00, F25B9/00, F24F11/83, F25B13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2020/15] | F25B49/02, F25B1/04, F25B41/06, F25B41/00, F25B9/00, F24F11/83 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON | [2020/16] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | [2020/15] | French: | CLIMATISEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI | [2020/15] |
Former [2020/15] | KLIMAANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER KLIMAANLAGE | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 27.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5628201 (BAHEL VIJAY [US], et al) [A] 1,12* figures 1, 15-16,21c *; | [Y]JP2012149857 (FUJI KOKI KK) [Y] 8,10,11 * paragraphs [0097] - [0098] *; | [XAYI]EP2730859 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0045] - [0068]; figures 1-3 * [A] 7,13-15 [Y] 8,10,11 [I] 1-6,8-12 | International search | [Y]JP2003156260 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0006]-[0008] and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]KR100461653B (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [Y] 8, 10, 11, 14, 15 * See claim 1. *; | [Y]US2010193156 (NAKATANI KAZUO [JP], et al) [Y] 3-15 * See paragraph [0067] and figure 7. *; | [A]JP2014214964 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-15* See claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [Y]JP5744219B (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0015], [0044] and figure 1. * | by applicant | US5628201 | JP2012149857 | EP2730859 |