08.08.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
06.07.2024 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.05.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.12.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.10.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.09.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2023 |
First examination report |
|
11.05.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.09.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
27.08.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
27.08.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
27.08.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
28.07.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
28.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.05.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
21.05.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
15.12.2020 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
01.09.2020 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.08.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
07.08.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
29.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
06.03.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
12.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
31.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|