EP3632140 - NETWORK BASED VIDEO SURVEILLANCE AND LOGISTICS FOR MULTIPLE USERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enigma-Bulwark Limited 1327 Ocean Avenue, Suite M Santa Monica, CA 90401 / US | [2021/41] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Safer, Inc. 4415 Hollywood Boulevard Hollywood, Florida 33021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROMERHAUSER, Dan 5307 Jackson Street Hollywood, Florida 33021 / US | 02 /
PAUGH, Joshua S. 7501 E. Mary Drive Tucson, Arizona 85730 / US | 03 /
BRADLEY, Nathaniel T. 4200 S. Saguaro Path Court Tucson, Arizona 85730 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18810464.0 | 30.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US35185 | Priority number, date | US201762513315P | 31.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762513315 P | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018222748 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632140 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/021, H04W4/029, // H04W4/18, H04W4/90, H04W12/08, H04L29/06 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
H04W4/021 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (US);
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (EP);
H04W4/06 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | H04W4/029 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | NETZWERKBASIERTE VIDEOÜBERWACHUNG UND LOGISTIK FÜR MEHRERE BENUTZER | [2020/15] | English: | NETWORK BASED VIDEO SURVEILLANCE AND LOGISTICS FOR MULTIPLE USERS | [2020/15] | French: | LOGISTIQUE ET SURVEILLANCE VIDÉO BASÉES SUR UN RÉSEAU POUR DE MULTIPLES UTILISATEURS | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 28.07.2020 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 29.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/37] | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2021 | 31.05.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014132765 (BILLAU RONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1-10* paragraphs [0020] , [0 42] - [0052]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO2014105349 (MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0022] - [0042]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2015097962 (RAUSCHER FRANK LUDWIG [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0022] - [0027] - [0 33] , [0 39] - [0041] - [0 46] - [0061]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US2014375800 (LIM KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* ; entire document *; | [XY]US2015097962 (RAUSCHER FRANK LUDWIG [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 9-13, 18-20 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0010], [0022], [0047], [0049], [0051], [0053], [0055], [0059] * [Y] 6-8, 14-17; | [Y]US2016360160 (EIZENBERG ROM [US]) [Y] 6-8, 14-17 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0044], [0049], [0051], [0077] * | by applicant | US2014132765 | WO2014105349 | US2015097962 |