EP3632554 - OXIDATION CATALYST STRUCTURE FOR EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF, EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT DEVICE FOR VEHICLE, CATALYST MOLDED BODY, AND GAS PURIFICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA Takao c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION HOKKAIDO UNIVERSITY Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome, Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 0600808 / JP | 02 /
NAKASAKA Yuta c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION HOKKAIDO UNIVERSITY Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome, Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 0600808 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIKAWA Takuya c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION KOKKAIDO UNIVERSITY Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome, Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 0600808 / JP | 04 /
KATO Sadahiro c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 05 /
FUKUSHIMA Masayuki c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 06 /
TAKAHASHI Hiroko c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 07 /
BANBA Yuichiro c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 08 /
SEKINE Kaori c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18810518.3 | 31.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018JP21084 | Priority number, date | JP20170108615 | 31.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017108615 | JP20170108616 | 31.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017108616 | JP20170108617 | 31.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017108617 | [2020/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018221696 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632554 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/14, B01D53/94, B01J29/035, B01J29/46, B01J29/68, B01J29/76, F01N3/28, B01J35/00, B01J37/16, C01B37/02 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
B01J29/0354 (EP);
B01J29/14 (EP,US);
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
B01J29/035 (EP);
B01J29/0356 (EP);
B01J29/0358 (EP);
B01J29/085 (US);
B01J29/16 (US);
B01J29/405 (US);
B01J29/46 (EP,US);
B01J29/48 (EP,US);
B01J29/655 (US);
B01J29/68 (EP,US);
B01J29/69 (EP,US);
B01J29/7084 (US);
B01J29/76 (EP);
B01J29/7669 (EP,US);
B01J29/7869 (EP,US);
B01J35/23 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP);
B01J35/393 (EP,US);
B01J35/394 (US);
B01J35/56 (US);
B01J37/0018 (US);
B01J37/0205 (US);
B01J37/0211 (US);
B01J37/10 (US);
B01J37/16 (EP);
B01J37/18 (US);
F01N3/28 (EP);
F01N3/2828 (US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP);
B01D2255/104 (EP);
B01D2255/2042 (US);
B01D2255/2063 (US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP);
B01D2255/2073 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20746 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20753 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20784 (EP);
B01D2255/20792 (EP);
B01D2255/2092 (US);
B01D2255/2094 (EP);
B01D2255/402 (US);
B01D2255/50 (EP);
B01D2255/9155 (US);
B01D2255/9202 (EP);
B01D2255/9205 (EP);
B01J2229/14 (US);
B01J2229/186 (EP,US);
B01J23/002 (EP);
B01J23/10 (EP);
B01J23/34 (EP);
B01J23/83 (EP);
B01J29/126 (EP);
B01J29/146 (EP);
B01J29/166 (EP);
B01J29/44 (EP);
B01J29/67 (EP);
B01J29/7469 (EP);
F01N2330/06 (US);
F01N2330/30 (US);
F01N2370/04 (US);
F01N2510/063 (US);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | B01J29/14, B01D53/94, B01J29/035, B01J29/46, B01J29/68, B01J29/76, F01N3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | OXIDATIONSKATALYSATORSTRUKTUR ZUR ABGASREINIGUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, ABGASBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUG, KATALYSATORFORMKÖRPER UND GASREINIGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/15] | English: | OXIDATION CATALYST STRUCTURE FOR EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF, EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT DEVICE FOR VEHICLE, CATALYST MOLDED BODY, AND GAS PURIFICATION METHOD | [2020/15] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CATALYSEUR D'OXYDATION POUR PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT POUR VÉHICULE, CORPS MOULÉ DE CATALYSEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ. | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2019 | Translation filed | 16.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0485180 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9,14,15 * example - * * table - *; | [X]JPH0796195 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [X] 1-9,14,15* the whole document *; | [X]US2004192947 (CHANE-CHING JEAN-YVES [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * example - * * claim - * * paragraph [0067] *; | [X]WO2012170421 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,14,15 * example - * * page 23, line 4 - line 5 * * par. A), B); page 1 *; | [X]WO2017072698 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [X] 1-13 * example - * * figure - *; | [X] - MAKSHINA ET AL, "Methanol oxidation on LaCo mixed oxide supported onto MCM-41 molecular sieve", CATALYSIS TODAY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071128), vol. 131, no. 1-4, doi:10.1016/J.CATTOD.2007.10.088, ISSN 0920-5861, pages 427 - 430, XP022432561 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cattod.2007.10.088 | [X] - HONG WANG ET AL, "Research into Eliminating Particulate from Diesel Engine Exhaust over Zeolite Covered with Catalysts of Perovskite-Type Oxides", 2009 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT TECHNOLOGY : ICEET 2009 ; GUILIN, CHINA, 16 - 18 OCTOBER 2009, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091016), ISBN 978-0-7695-3819-8, pages 493 - 495, XP031588294 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - LI SHIWEN ET AL, "Diffusion-Driven Selectivity in Oxidation of CO in the Presence of Propylene Using Zeolite Nano Shell as Membrane", ACS CATALYSIS, US, vol. 4, no. 12, doi:10.1021/cs501349b, ISSN 2155-5435, (20141105), pages 4299 - 4303, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/cs501349b, XP055785093 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cs501349b | [X] - SHIWEN LI ET AL, "Diffusion-Driven Selectivity in Oxidation of CO in the Presence of Propylene Using Zeolite Nano Shell as Membrane", ACS CATALYSIS, US, (20141205), vol. 4, no. 12, doi:10.1021/cs501349b, ISSN 2155-5435, pages 4299 - 4303, XP055676549 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cs501349b | International search | JPH0549943 [y] (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO) [y] 2,23; | US5849652 [a] (DAVIES GEOFFREY [US], et al) [a] 1-34; | WO2010097108 [xy] (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK], et al) [x] 1,3-22,24-34 [y] 2,23; | WO2016014691 [a] (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [a] 1-34; | JP2016529190 [a] [a] 1-34; | JP2017128480 [px] (JGC CATALYSTS & CHEMICALS LTD, et al)[px] 1,3-8,14-19,21,22,31,32; | [aA] - Zhijie Wu, Sarika Goel, Minkee Choi, Enrique Iglesia, "Hydrothermal synthesis of LTA-encapsulated metal clusters and consequences for catalyst stability, reactivity, and selectivity", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (20140131), vol. 311, doi:10.1016/j.jcat.2013.12.021, ISSN 0021-9517, pages 458 - 468, XP028612174 [a] 1-34 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcat.2013.12.021 | by applicant | US2003109383 | - Journal of the Society of Oil Engineers, (19940000), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 480 - 491 |