EP3713968 - FUNCTIONALISED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phosphonics Limited 7 The Quadrangle Grove Business Park Wantage Oxon OX12 9FA / GB | [2023/31] |
Former [2020/40] | For all designated states Phosphonics Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton, Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Nicholas P. c/o PhosphonicS Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | 02 /
FORFAR, Laura C. c/o PhosphonicS Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | 03 /
MURRAY, Paul M. c/o PhosphonicS Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | 04 /
NORTH, Christopher c/o PhosphonicS Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | 05 /
WATSON, Alexander c/o PhosphonicS Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | [2023/13] |
Former [2020/40] | 01 /
TAYLOR, Nicholas, P. c/o PhosphonicS Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | ||
02 /
FORFAR, Laura, C. c/o PhosphonicS Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | |||
03 /
MURRAY, Paul, M. c/o PhosphonicS Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | |||
04 /
NORTH, Christopher c/o PhosphonicS Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | |||
05 /
WATSON, Alexander c/o PhosphonicS Limited 8 Old Station Business Park Compton Berkshire RG20 6NE / GB | Representative(s) | Geary, Stephen Bawden & Associates Rothamsted Enterprises Russell Building West Common Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | [2023/13] |
Former [2020/40] | Geary, Stephen Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB | Application number, filing date | 18811188.4 | 22.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018EP82265 | Priority number, date | GB20170019418 | 22.11.2017 Original published format: GB 201719418 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101883 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713968 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3713968 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
C08B15/00 (EP,GB);
C08B3/10 (EP,US);
B01J20/24 (GB,US);
B01J20/28019 (EP,US);
B01J20/28023 (EP,US);
B01J20/28033 (EP,US);
B01J20/3212 (EP);
B01J20/3251 (EP);
C01G55/002 (US);
C01G7/00 (US);
C02F1/285 (GB);
C02F1/286 (EP,US);
C02F1/62 (GB);
C08B15/005 (EP);
C08B31/00 (GB);
C08B31/04 (US);
B01D15/361 (EP);
B01J2220/4825 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKTIONALISIERTE VERBINDUNGEN | [2020/40] | English: | FUNCTIONALISED COMPOUNDS | [2020/40] | French: | COMPOSÉS FONCTIONNALISÉS | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 19.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | LU | 22.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010093662 (DEFAYE JACQUES [FR], et al); | [Y]WO2011128061 (PHOSPHONICS LTD [GB], et al); | by applicant | JPS486993B |