EP3714270 - FLAVIVIRUS DIAGNOSTIC ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secretary of State for Health and Social Care Ministerial Correspondence and Public Enquiries Department of Health and Social Care 39 Victoria Street London SW1H 0EU / GB | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEDDER, Richard c/o Public Health England Colindale Avenue London Greater London NW9 5EQ / GB | 02 /
DICKS, Steven c/o Public Health England Colindale Avenue London Greater London NW9 5EQ / GB | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/22] |
Former [2020/40] | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18811905.1 | 23.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018GB53399 | Priority number, date | GB20170019592 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: GB 201719592 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019102215 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714270 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714270 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/56983 (EP,US);
G01N2333/185 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLAVIVIRUS-DIAGNOSETEST | [2020/40] | English: | FLAVIVIRUS DIAGNOSTIC ASSAY | [2020/40] | French: | DOSAGE DIAGNOSTIQUE DE FLAVIVIRUS | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 24.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | MC | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | LU | 23.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2007106050 (NAT ENVIRONMENT AGENCY [SG], et al); | [XI]WO2016022071 (MP BIOMEDICALS ASIA PACIFIC PTE LTD [SG]); | [XI]WO2017192756 (NIRMIDAS BIOTECH INC [US]); | [XI]US2017336404 (ALI MASARRAT [US]); | [XP]WO2018026845 (INBIOS INT INC [US]); | [XPI]WO2018197406 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) |