EP3746350 - SPARE TIRE WINCH WITH AUTOGENOUS TIRE LOWERING MECHANISM AND LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavo Otomotiv Ticaret Ve Sanayi Anonim Sirketi Tosb Otomotiv Yan San. Ihtisas Org.San.Bölg.1.Cad.15.Sok.No:3 Sekerpinar Cayirova 41420 Kocaeli / TR | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yilmaz, Mustafa TOSB -1. Cadde, 15. Sokak No:3 Kocaeli / TR | 02 /
Yalcin, Erol Can TOSB -1. Cadde, 15. Sokak No:3 Kocaeli / TR | 03 /
Saritas, Umur Sezer TOSB -1. Cadde, 15. Sokak No:3 Kocaeli / TR | 04 /
Cicek, Ovgu Yagiz TOSB -1. Cadde, 15. Sokak No:3 Kocaeli / TR | 05 /
Dede, Nil Nisa TOSB -1. Cadde, 15. Sokak No:3 Kocaeli / TR | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Yamankaradeniz, Kemal Destek Patent, Inc. Maslak Mah. Büyükdere Cad., No: 243 Kat: 13, Spine Tower, Sariyer 34485 Istanbul / TR | [2022/06] |
Former [2020/50] | Yamankaradeniz, Kemal Destek Patent, Inc. Eclipse Business D Blok No. 5 Maslak 34398 Istanbul / TR | Application number, filing date | 18811943.2 | 08.03.2018 | [2020/50] | WO2018TR50086 | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019172857 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746350 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3746350 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62D43/04 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
B62D43/045 (EP,US);
B66D1/58 (US);
B66D3/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESERVEREIFENWINDE MIT AUTOGENEM REIFENSENKMECHANISMUS UND SCHLOSS | [2020/50] | English: | SPARE TIRE WINCH WITH AUTOGENOUS TIRE LOWERING MECHANISM AND LOCK | [2020/50] | French: | TREUIL DE PNEU DE SECOURS DOTÉ D'UN MÉCANISME D'ABAISSEMENT DE PNEU AUTOGÈNE ET D'UN VERROU | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 04.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2018 | AL | 09.02.2022 | AT | 09.02.2022 | CY | 09.02.2022 | CZ | 09.02.2022 | DK | 09.02.2022 | EE | 09.02.2022 | ES | 09.02.2022 | FI | 09.02.2022 | HR | 09.02.2022 | IT | 09.02.2022 | LT | 09.02.2022 | LV | 09.02.2022 | MC | 09.02.2022 | MK | 09.02.2022 | MT | 09.02.2022 | NL | 09.02.2022 | PL | 09.02.2022 | RO | 09.02.2022 | RS | 09.02.2022 | SE | 09.02.2022 | SI | 09.02.2022 | SK | 09.02.2022 | SM | 09.02.2022 | IE | 08.03.2022 | LU | 08.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | FR | 09.04.2022 | BG | 09.05.2022 | NO | 09.05.2022 | GR | 10.05.2022 | IS | 09.06.2022 | PT | 09.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 08.03.2018 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 09.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 09.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 09.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 09.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 09.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 09.04.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NO | 09.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]CN207002094U (BAIC MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,4,7,8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0031] - [0033] - [0041] , [0042]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2017191606 (PROMA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,4,6-8 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 8 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 4 * * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 14; figures 1,4,8 *; | [A]US5368280 (NG BILL [CA]) [A] 1,4,7,8 * abstract * |