EP3692454 - MAINTAINING SHARDS IN KV STORE WITH DYNAMIC KEY RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zadara Storage, Inc. 6 Venture Suite 140 Irvine, California 92618 / US | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYAKAS, Alex Ha-Sahlav st. 35 1 3479038 Haifa / IL | 02 /
KAUSHIK V., Shyam 1B802 Akme Encore Apartment ITPL Main Road Bangalore 560 037 / IN | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18811956.4 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018US52545 | Priority number, date | US201715726192 | 05.10.2017 Original published format: US201715726192 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019070449 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692454 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/27 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
G06F16/278 (EP,US);
G06F16/27 (US);
G06F16/221 (US);
G06F16/2246 (US);
G06F9/466 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | AUFRECHTERHALTEN VON SHARDS IN EINEM KV-SPEICHER MIT DYNAMISCHEM SCHLÜSSELBEREICH | [2020/33] | English: | MAINTAINING SHARDS IN KV STORE WITH DYNAMIC KEY RANGE | [2020/33] | French: | MAINTIEN DE FRAGMENTS DANS UNE MÉMOIRE DE KV AVEC PLAGE DYNAMIQUE DE CLÉS | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 29.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2023 | 07.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/06] | 05.10.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2012254175 (HOROWITZ ELIOT [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0006] , [0010] - [0012] - [0014] , [0065] , [0077] , [0083]; figures 5, 6 *; | [A]US2016085839 (D HALLUIN CARL RENE [BE], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 12]; figures 5, 8 *; | [I] - CHRISTOPHER MITCHELL ET AL, "Balancing CPU and Network in the Cell Distributed B-Tree Store Balancing CPU and Network in the Cell Distributed B-Tree Store", THIS PAPER IS INCLUDED IN THE PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2016 USENIX ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE (USENIX ATC '16) @BULLET DENVER, CO, USA 2016 USENIX ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE 451, (20160624), XP055550872 [I] 1 * figures 1, 2 and 3 * * paragraph "2.1 Overview"; page 452 * * paragraph "2.2 Server-Side B-tree Operations"; page 453 * | [A] - MARCOS K. AGUILERA ET AL, "A practical scalable distributed B-tree", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VLDB ENDOWMENT, New York, NY, (20080801), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.14778/1453856.1453922, ISSN 2150-8097, pages 598 - 609, XP055550391 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * 1. INTRODUCTION; page 598 * * 2.2 Design outline; page 600 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.14778/1453856.1453922 |