EP3711243 - TECHNIQUES TO JOINTLY CONFIGURE DEMODULATION REFERENCE SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18812538.9 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018US61050 | Priority number, date | GR20170100520 | 17.11.2017 Original published format: GR 20170100520 | US201816189244 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: US201816189244 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019099517 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3711243 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
H04L5/0051 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/086 (US);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W74/04 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUM GEMEINSAMEN KONFIGURIEREN VON DEMODULATIONSREFERENZSIGNALEN | [2020/39] | English: | TECHNIQUES TO JOINTLY CONFIGURE DEMODULATION REFERENCE SIGNALS | [2020/39] | French: | TECHNIQUES POUR CONFIGURER CONJOINTEMENT DES SIGNAUX DE RÉFÉRENCE DE DÉMODULATION | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 14.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2014113546 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [X] 1,10,17,24,28 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0127] *; | [X]EP2922225 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,11,17,24,28 * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0154] *; | [Y]WO2016188312 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 13,20,29 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0095] *; | [XY] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Design of DL DMRS for data transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1712243, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051315060 [X] 1-8,12,16-19,21-27,30 * sections 1, 2.4;; figure 6 * [Y] 13,20,29 | [X] - MOTOROLA MOBILITY ET AL, "UL DMRS for sTTI", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1708295_UL DMRS FOR STTI, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051273488 [X] 1-9,12,16-19,21-28,30 * the whole document * | [X] - POTEVIO, "Uplink DMRS Design for 2-symbol sPUSCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1708536 UPLINK DMRS DESIGN FOR 2-SYMBOL SPUSCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051273728 [X] 1-9,12,16-19,21-28,30 * section 2.1 * | [X] - VIVO, "Details on DMRS design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, P.R. Czech; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1712842_DETAILS ON DMRS DESIGN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051315654 [X] 1,14,15,17,24,28 * section 2.3;; figure 5 * |