EP3636404 - KNEADING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Spindle Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 2-30, Shioe 4-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-8510 / JP | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Hisashi c/o NIHON SPINDLE MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 2-30 Shioe 4-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-8510 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Yoshihiko c/o NIHON SPINDLE MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 2-30 Shioe 4-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-8510 / JP | 03 /
KISHIMA, Takamasa c/o NIHON SPINDLE MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 2-30 Shioe 4-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-8510 / JP | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18813287.2 | 29.03.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018JP13322 | Priority number, date | JP20170111682 | 06.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017111682 | JP20170111683 | 06.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017111683 | [2020/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018225353 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636404 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3636404 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/28, B29B7/18, B29B7/74, B29B7/82, // G01N21/55, G01N21/84, G01N23/00, G01N27/04 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
B29B7/183 (EP,US);
B29B7/186 (EP,US);
B29B7/28 (US);
B29B7/283 (EP);
B29B7/286 (EP,US);
B29B7/7495 (EP,US);
B29B7/823 (EP);
B29B7/826 (EP);
G01N2021/8411 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | B29B7/28, B29B7/18, B29B7/74, G01N11/00, G01N21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2020/16] | B29B7/28, B01F7/00, B01F15/00, B29B7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNETVORRICHTUNG | [2020/16] | English: | KNEADING DEVICE | [2020/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MALAXAGE | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2019 | Translation filed | 03.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 08.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5193471 (N.N.) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * * figure 6; claim 1 * [A] 3-10; | [X]JPH06865 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0006] , [0009] - [0016] * * abstract *; | [T]CN2382535Y (UNIV HUANAN SCIENCE & ENG [CN]) [T] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]JP2000280239 (NIPPON PORIPURO KK) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0006] - [0019] * * abstract *; | [A]JP2015155148 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2016024435 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * [ citations see US 2017/225359 A1 ] *; | [X]JP2016179643 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0005] - [0008] - [0014] - [0031] - [0032] - [0038] * * figures 1-4; claims 1-5 *; | [XA]JP2017077649 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0008] , [0011] - [0035] * * figures 1,4; claims 1-9 * [A] 3-10; | [AP]US2017225359 (MANABE CHITAKA [JP], et al) [AP] 1-10 * paragraphs [0029] - [0055] * * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS52103478 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD) [A] 1-10* , *; | [X]JPS588543 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1, 10 * , *; | [A]JPH02235715 (TOYO MACHINERY & METAL) [A] 1-10 * , *; | [X]JPH07214538 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1, 9, 10 * , *; | [Y]JP2000167372 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 7 * , *; | [XYA]JP2016179643 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-6, 10 * , * [Y] 7 [A] 8, 9; | [A]JP2017083322 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-10 * , * | by applicant | JPS574618B |