EP3636716 - CURING ACCELERATOR FOR OXIDATIVELY POLYMERIZED UNSATURATED RESIN, PRINTING INK, AND PAINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI Akinori c/o DIC Corporation Chiba-Plant 12 Yawata-kaigandori Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8585 / JP | 02 /
ODASHIMA Takayuki c/o DIC Corporation Chiba Plant 12 Yawata-kaigandori Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8585 / JP | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18813293.0 | 15.05.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018JP18688 | Priority number, date | JP20170113409 | 08.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017113409 | [2020/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018225466 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636716 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C07F13/00, C07F15/02, C08K3/10, C08K5/09, C08K5/3445, C09D7/63, C09D11/03, C09D11/102, C09D201/00, C09F9/00, C08K5/098, C09D167/08, // C08K5/17, C08K5/29, C08K5/3437 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
C08K5/098 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/0025 (KR);
C08L57/00 (US);
C07F13/00 (EP);
C07F15/02 (EP);
C08K3/10 (EP);
C08K5/09 (EP);
C08K5/3445 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/00 (EP);
C08L87/00 (US);
C09D11/03 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/102 (EP);
C09D167/08 (EP);
C09D201/00 (EP);
C09D7/63 (EP,KR,US);
C09F9/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/17 (EP);
C08K5/29 (EP);
C08K5/3437 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D167/08, C08K5/098, C08K5/0008, C08K5/3445 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | C08L101/00, C07F13/00, C07F15/02, C08K3/10, C08K5/09, C08K5/3445, C09D7/63, C09D11/03, C09D11/102, C09D201/00, C09F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | HÄRTUNGSBESCHLEUNIGER FÜR EIN OXIDATIV POLYMERISIERTES UNGESÄTTIGTES HARZ, DRUCKFARBE UND FARBE | [2020/16] | English: | CURING ACCELERATOR FOR OXIDATIVELY POLYMERIZED UNSATURATED RESIN, PRINTING INK, AND PAINT | [2020/16] | French: | ACCÉLÉRATEUR DE DURCISSEMENT POUR RÉSINE INSATURÉE POLYMÉRISÉE PAR OXYDATION, ENCRE D'IMPRESSION, ET PEINTURE | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2019 | Translation filed | 04.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 27.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/32] | 10.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005245639 (OOSTVEEN EVERARDUS A [NL], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * tables VI-VII *; | [A]US8664306 (HAGE RONALD [NL], et al) [A] 1-6 * example - *; | [A]US9145501 (WEIJNEN JOHN [NL], et al) [A] 1-6* example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2017001666 (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH]) [A] 1-6 * claim - *; | [X] - MICCICHE F ET AL, "The combination of reducing agents/iron as environmentally friendlier alternatives for Co-based driers in the drying of alkyd paints", PROGRESS IN ORGANIC COATINGS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 53, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.PORGCOAT.2004.12.008, ISSN 0300-9440, (20050601), pages 99 - 105, (20050601), XP025391098 [X] 1,5,6 * table 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.porgcoat.2004.12.008 | International search | [XA]JPS6245676 (DAICEL CHEM) [X] 1, 6-7 [A] 2-5; | [A]JP2010285594 (AJINOMOTO KK) [A] 1-7* , *; | [A]JP2013531715 [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]JP2015151468 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS, et al) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]JP2015183056 (T & K TOKA CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]JP2016507609 [A] 1-7 * , & *; | [A]WO2017043406 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-7 | by applicant | JPH06172689 |