EP3637912 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING DUAL CONNECTIVITY IN NR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YI, Yunjung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18813316.9 | 08.06.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018KR06533 | Priority number, date | US201762517100P | 08.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762517100 P | US201762519815P | 14.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762519815 P | US201762520671P | 16.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762520671 P | US201762534223P | 19.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762534223 P | US201762564211P | 27.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762564211 P | US201762590341P | 23.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762590341 P | US201762590395P | 24.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762590395 P | US201762590618P | 26.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762590618 P | [2020/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018226065 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3637912 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W76/15, // H04W88/06 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
H04W72/1268 (EP,CN);
H04W72/23 (CN,KR);
H04W76/15 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0098 (EP,CN);
H04W72/04 (CN,US);
H04W72/1215 (CN,KR);
H04W72/56 (EP,US);
H04W72/566 (CN);
H04L5/001 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W76/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON DUALER KONNEKTIVITÄT IN NR | [2020/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING DUAL CONNECTIVITY IN NR | [2020/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PRENDRE EN CHARGE LA DOUBLE CONNECTIVITÉ DANS NR | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2020 | Translation filed | 07.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 06.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/31] | 01.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.02.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]CA2996405 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5-12,15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1,2 * [A] 3,4,13,14; | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Study on New Radio (NR) access technology (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD ; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION ; 3GPP TR 38.912, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20170324), vol. TSG RAN, no. V14.0.0, pages 1 - 74, XP051295707 [Y] 1,2,5-12,15 * Sections 9.8.3.1, 8.5, 13.2.3 and 13.3 * | [A] - MEDIATEK INC, "TDM UL transmission for TDD-FDD DL CA-capable UE with single transmitter", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, CZ; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-140236 TDM UL TRANSMISSION FOR TDD-FDD DL CA CAPABLE UE WITH SINGLE TRANSMITTER, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN1/Docs/, (20140209), XP050735789 [A] 1-15 * Whole section 2 * | [A] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "LTE-NR co-existence for downlink", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170116 - 20170120, (20170116), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1700630, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170116), XP051208155 [A] 1-15 * Section 3.1 * | [IP] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Remaining issues in NR LTE coexistence", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170912), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1715904, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1709/Docs/, (20170912), XP051329582 [IP] 1,3,4,11,13,14 * Section 2 * | International search | [A]US2016227570 (WEI CHIA-HUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0007]-[0008], [0027]-[0037]; and figures 3A-3B. *; | [YA] - CATT, "Support of UL Carrier Sharing between NR-LTE", R1-1707528, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #89, Hangzhou, P.R. China, (20170506), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_89/Docs/, XP051261876 [Y] 1-5, 9-15 * See sections 1-2. * [A] 6-8 | [Y] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on Scheduling/HARQ for Dual Connectivity", R1-1707667, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #89, Hangzhou, P.R. China, (20170506), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_89/Docs/, XP051262007 [Y] 1-5, 9-15 * See sections 1-5. * | [Y] - APPLE INC, "Uplink Sharing in NSA Mode", R1-1708276, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #89, Hangzhou, P.R. China, (20170507), XP051263167 [Y] 2, 10, 12 * See sections 1-3 and figure 2. * | [A] - NEC, "Dual Connectivity between E-UTRA and NR", R1-1707808, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #89, Hangzhou, P.R. China, (20170505), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_89/Docs/, XP051261310 [A] 1-15 * See sections 1-2. * |