Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11538993 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2022 | B2 | US2021280788 | 09.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN71549 | 05.01.2018 | CN201710414315 | 05.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102237750B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2021 | B1 | KR20190103412 | 04.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN71549 | 05.01.2018 | CN201710414315 | 05.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7136408B | Global Dossier | 13.09.2022 | B2 | JP2020522607 | 30.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN71549 | 05.01.2018 | CN201710414315 | 05.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3636797 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2023 | B1 | EP3636797 | 28.04.2021 | A4 | EP3636797 | 15.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN71549 | 05.01.2018 | CN201710414315 | 05.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018223695 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710414315 | 05.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108977762B | Global Dossier | 27.12.2019 | B | CN108977762 | 11.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710414315 | 05.06.2017 |