EP3587890 - MULTILAYER HEAT-INSULATING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAGUCHI, Atsushi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Takeo C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
ISHIKAWA, Takafumi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 1088215 / JP | 04 /
HIRATA, Naoya C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 05 /
HIROTSU, Satoshi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18813436.5 | 04.06.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018JP21380 | Priority number, date | JP20170114553 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017114553 | [2020/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018225688 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3587890 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/02, B64G1/58, B64C1/06 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
F16L59/029 (EP);
B64G1/58 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/281 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/322 (EP);
B32B3/02 (EP);
B32B3/12 (US);
B32B5/028 (EP);
B32B7/08 (EP);
B32B7/09 (EP);
B32B2250/42 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/205 (EP);
B32B2307/304 (EP,US);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US);
B64C1/066 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | F16L59/02, B64G1/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGER WÄRMEDÄMMSTOFF | [2020/01] | English: | MULTILAYER HEAT-INSULATING MATERIAL | [2020/01] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE MULTICOUCHE | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2019 | Translation filed | 25.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 14.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0005533 (BAINS HARDING LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-3* page 5, lines 5-26; figure 2 *; | [A]JP2000072099 (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0005]; figure 3 *; | [A]JP2002337800 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0006] - [0011]; figure 7 *; | [A]JP2007210618 (SEKISUI PLASTICS) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]JP2013238305 (NAGOYA OIL CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0020]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]JP2014184875 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0015] , [0018]; figure 2 *; | [A]JP2017078470 (TOSKA BANOK CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020]; figures 1-4,7-9,11 * | International search | [Y]JPH04134000U (NEC ENGINEERING, LTD.) [Y] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH09152088 (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG) [A] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000072100 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1-6* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2007210618 (SEKISUI PLASTICS) [Y] 4-6 * , paragraphs [0026]-[0040], fig. 1-11 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013238305 (NAGOYA OIL CHEM CO LTD) [Y] 4-6 * , paragraphs [0008], [0019]-[0021], fig. 1, 4-5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2017078470 (TOSKA BANOK CO LTD) [Y] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH09152088 |