EP3636900 - CONTROL STRATEGY, DEVICE, AND NON-VOLATILE COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Great Wall Motor Company Limited No. 2266 Chaoyang South St. Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states Great Wall Motor Company Limited No.2266 Chaoyang South St. Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Tao No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding Hebei 071000 / CN | 02 /
XU, Liming No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding Hebei 071000 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Fabao No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding Hebei 071000 / CN | 04 /
YIN, Ji No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding Hebei 071000 / CN | 05 /
HU, Jiajia No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding Hebei 071000 / CN | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Ege Lee & Roider Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Wagenfeld-Straße 24 80807 München / DE | [2023/48] |
Former [2020/16] | Ege Lee & Partner Patentanwälte PartGmbB Walter-Gropius-Straße 15 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18813697.2 | 07.06.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018CN90303 | Priority number, date | CN201710434182 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710434182 | [2020/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018224019 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636900 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3636900 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02D13/02, F02D41/24, F02B31/08, F02D41/04, F02D41/06, // F02D41/00 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
F02D41/2438 (EP,US);
F02D13/0207 (EP,CN,RU);
F02D13/04 (US);
F01L1/22 (US);
F01L13/0015 (US);
F01L13/0021 (US);
F01L13/0063 (EP);
F02D13/0257 (EP);
F02D13/0276 (CN,RU);
F02D41/0002 (EP,CN,RU,US);
F02D41/009 (EP,CN,RU);
F02D41/045 (US);
F02D41/06 (US);
F02D41/064 (EP,CN,RU);
F02D41/10 (US);
F02D41/12 (US);
F02D41/1401 (CN,RU);
F01L1/181 (US);
F01L1/185 (EP);
F01L1/462 (US);
F01L2001/467 (EP);
F01L2013/0068 (EP);
F01L2305/00 (EP,US);
F01L2800/09 (EP);
F02D2013/0292 (EP,CN,US);
F02D2013/0296 (CN,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP);
F02D2041/0015 (EP,CN);
F02D2041/002 (EP,CN);
F02D2200/021 (US);
F02D2250/16 (EP);
F02D41/042 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | F02D13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | STEUERSTRATEGIE, VORRICHTUNG UND NICHTFLÜCHTIGES COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2020/16] | English: | CONTROL STRATEGY, DEVICE, AND NON-VOLATILE COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | [2020/16] | French: | STRATÉGIE DE COMMANDE, DISPOSITIF, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE INFORMATIQUE NON VOLATIL | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2020 | Translation filed | 08.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 14.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5373818 (UNGER HARALD [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 21; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US6123053 (HARA SEINOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* column 6, line 5 - column 8, line 59 *; | [A]US2002035976 (NAKAMURA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] - [0009] *; | [A]US2006144356 (SELLNAU MARK C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0072] - [0083] *; | [A]US2006219196 (ASADA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0109] - [0119] * | International search | [A]US2012143465 (KIM CHONGWON [KR]) [A] 1-10; | [A]CN104153839 (GREAT WALL MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-10; | [A]KR101472687B (HYUNDAI KEFICO CORP [KR])[A] 1-10; | [A]CN106555681 (GREAT WALL MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-10; | [A]CN106640386 (GREAT WALL MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-10; | [A]CN106640380 (GREAT WALL MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-10 |