EP3603354 - PCB OPTICAL ISOLATION BY NONUNIFORM CATCH PAD STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waymo LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAZZOLI, Augusto 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View CA 94043 / US | 02 /
GASSEND, Blaise 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View CA 94043 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Chettle, John Edward, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18814037.0 | 22.05.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US33790 | Priority number, date | US201715613580 | 05.06.2017 Original published format: US201715613580 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018226393 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3603354 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/11, G01S17/89, G01S17/93, G01S17/42, G01S7/481, H05K1/02, G01S17/931 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H05K1/0274 (EP,US);
G01S17/42 (EP,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
G01S7/4813 (EP,US);
H05K1/113 (EP,US);
H05K1/115 (EP);
H05K1/116 (EP);
H05K2201/0108 (EP);
H05K2201/094 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09454 (EP);
H05K2201/09481 (EP);
H05K2201/10121 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | H05K1/11, G01S17/89 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE LEITERPLATTENISOLIERUNG DURCH UNEINHEITLICHEN CATCH-PAD STAPEL | [2020/06] | English: | PCB OPTICAL ISOLATION BY NONUNIFORM CATCH PAD STACK | [2020/06] | French: | ISOLATION OPTIQUE DE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ PAR EMPILEMENT DE TAMPONS DE CAPTURE NON UNIFORME | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 17.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005195051 (MCKINZIE WILLIAM E III [US]) [X] 1,5-7,10,14,15,17 * paragraph [0021]; figure 21 *; | [X]US2005225382 (MILLER CHARLES A [US]) [X] 1,6-8,10,14-17 * paragraphs [0029] - [0033]; figure 3 *; | [X]WO2011010393 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,10,13-15,17 * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 7; figure 1A *; | [XY]WO2013093976 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,10,13,15,17 * paragraphs [0014] - [0023]; figures 1A,1B * [Y] 2,3,11,12,18-20; | [Y]US2016282453 (PENNECOT GAETAN [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,11,12,18-20* paragraphs [0074] , [0081]; figure 2B * | International search | [A]JP2006108434 (TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TEC) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0022] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2011067915 (KIM HAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0045] and figures 2-5. *; | [A]KR20130015661 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0034]-[0071] and figures 1-9. *; | [A]US2013126702 (TSUKAGOSHI KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0036] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2015236064 (CHEN SZU-YING [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0031] and figures 2a-2b. * | by applicant | US2005195051 | US2005225382 | WO2011010393 | WO2013093976 |