EP3624992 - ROTARY BRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osborn, LLC 2350 Salisbury Road North Richmond IN 47374 / US | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEISER, Brian 810 Swallow Road Cambridge City, IN 47327 / US | 02 /
VANWINKLE, Brad 3515 National Road West Richmond, IN 47374 / US | 03 /
BAUMGARDNER, Zachary 6264 S. 200 E. Lynn, IN 47355 / US | 04 /
SMALL, Zachary 301 Randolph Street Richmond, IN 47374 / US | 05 /
CLIFFORD, Shane 4580 S. Co. Road 8000 W. Glenwood, IN 46133 / US | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18814056.0 | 05.06.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018US36166 | Priority number, date | US201762515122P | 05.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762515122 P | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018226768 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624992 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B24D13/10, B24D13/20 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
B24D13/10 (EP,US);
B24D13/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | B24D13/10, B24B29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | ROTATIONSBÜRSTE | [2020/13] | English: | ROTARY BRUSH | [2020/13] | French: | BROSSE ROTATIVE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 06.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS61241071 (AMAGASA BRUSH SEISAKUSHO KK); | [XYI]US5406669 (LESIW BILL [US]); | [XYI]US6217431 (BRINKMANN MANFRED [DE]) | International search | [A]US2866989 (PETERSON RUBEN O, et al) [A] 1-34 * See claim 1; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]JPH0728433U (AMADA CORPORATION) [A] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0010]-[0015]; claims 1-2; and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US5926904 (WARNER RUEBEN BROWN [US]) [A] 1-34 * See claims 1-8; and figure 8. *; | [A]US6035482 (BELANGER MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-34* See column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 9; and figures 1-3. *; | [XA]US2011092144 (WOODS RICHARD S [US], et al) [X] 1, 31-34 * See paragraphs [0002], [0023]-[0026]; and figures 1-6. * [A] 2-30 | by applicant | JPS61241071 | US5406669 | US6217431 | EP1356748 |