EP3685125 - SENSOR MOUNTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexagon Technology AS Korsegata 4B P.O. Box 836 6002 Sentrum, Alesund / NO | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALVORSEN, Ken 7957 Yellow Knife Drive Lincoln, Nebraska 68505 / US | 02 /
BURKS, Brian 13760 East Arapahoe Rd Centennial, Colorado 80121 / US | 03 /
CROCKER, Ryan 3211 Rawhide Drive Lincoln, Nebraska 68507 / US | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Downing, Michael Philip Downing IP Limited Grosvenor House 7 Horseshoe Crescent Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 1LJ / GB | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 18814744.1 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018US60886 | Priority number, date | US201762585671P | 14.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762585671 P | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019099432 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3685125 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3685125 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01D11/30, F17C13/08, F17C13/02 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
F17C13/083 (EP,KR,US);
G01D11/30 (EP,KR,US);
F17C13/02 (EP,US);
F17C1/002 (US);
F17C13/025 (KR,US);
F17C13/08 (US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/0119 (US);
F17C2201/035 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/054 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2205/0107 (US);
F17C2205/013 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2205/0157 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2221/011 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2221/014 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2221/035 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2223/035 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2250/043 (US);
F17C2250/0465 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2250/0491 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2260/015 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2270/0105 (US);
F17C2270/011 (US);
F17C2270/0171 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/31] | G01D11/30, F17C13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORMONTAGESYSTEM | [2020/31] | English: | SENSOR MOUNTING SYSTEM | [2020/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MONTAGE DE CAPTEURS | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/31] | SYSTÈME DE MONTAGE DE CAPTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 22.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP22185277.5 / EP4092389 | EP22204346.5 / EP4145092 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | AT | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | NL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4240206 (BARESH JOSEPH M [US], et al); | [A]US5335422 (FERGUSON CLAYTON L [US]); | [A]US5535143 (FACE ALLEN [US]); | [A]US2005103400 (EICHELBERGER DONALD P [US], et al); | [A]US2008282709 (SUGAWARA ICHIRO [JP]) |