EP3720613 - MEDIA APPLICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMANN, Sieghard Roesseweg 15 71116 Gaertringen / DE | 02 /
SCHULER, Robin Waiblingerstr. 90 71334 Waiblingen / DE | 03 /
KLEEMANN, Andreas Nelkenstrasse 2 71069 Sindelfingen / DE | 04 /
SZELL, Istvan Lilienstrasse 8. 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 05 /
DOEPNER, Jan Moltkestr. 27 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 06 /
PREHN, Janine Marienstr. 16 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 07 /
SIEBER, Gustav Kohlplatz 12 88239 Wangen / DE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 18814830.8 | 29.11.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018EP83043 | Priority number, date | DE201710222002 | 06.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017222002 | DE201710221997 | 06.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017221997 | DE201710223507 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017223507 | DE201810220412 | 28.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018220412 | [2020/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019110424 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720613 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B05B12/00, B05B17/06 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
B05B12/00 (EP,US);
B05B13/005 (EP);
G01B21/20 (EP);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G03B37/00 (EP);
G05D7/00 (EP);
B05B17/0607 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | MEDIENAUFTRAGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/42] | English: | MEDIA APPLICATION DEVICE | [2020/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION DE MATIÈRE | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 06.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.05.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0508130 (TACCON COSTRUZIONI MECANICHE S [IT]) [X] 1,4* figures 1, 2 *; | [X]DE19525528 (KEMPF BERNHARD DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 4; figure 1 * * column 5, line 38 - line 54 *; | [X]US2005100680 (BUSTGENS BURKHARD [DE]) [X] 1,6,11 * paragraph [0051]; figure 6; claim 20 *; | US2011039021 [ ] (PERSSON THORD [SE], et al) [ ] * figure 1 *; | [XI]DE102012006371 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,11,12 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0080]; figures 1-2 * [I] 9,10; | [X]US2013122186 (HOPPEL STEFFON L [US]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0092] *; | [X]EP2641661 (HEXAGON TECHNOLOGY CT GMBH [CH]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0135]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2799150 (HEXAGON TECHNOLOGY CT GMBH [CH]) [A] 4,5 * paragraph [0110]; figures 12, 19 *; | [X]US2015147460 (MANZI ALESSANDRO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11,13 * paragraph [0112]; figures 1,4,6 *; | [X]WO2016109721 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 13; figures 1, 7c, 13 *; | [X]WO2017191225 (SPRAYPRINTER OÜ [EE]) [X] 1 * page 11, line 14 - page 12, line 2; figure 1 *; | [E]WO2019016016 (MEXENCE DIGITAL & ROBOTICS [LU]) [E] 1-3,6-8 * page 8, line 25 - line 28; figure 1 * |