EP3794375 - NON-INVASIVE WEARABLE BRAIN INTERFACE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hi LLC 5042 Wilshire Boulevard 26878 Los Angeles, CA 90036 / US | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Hi LLC 5042 Wilshire Boulevard 26878 Los Angeles, CA 90036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DO VALLE, Bruno 300 Allston St Apt 516 Brighton, Massachusetts 02135 / US | 02 /
JIN, Rong 3 Bramble Way Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US | 03 /
DAHLE, Jacob 72 Chandler St. Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US | 04 /
KATNANI, Husam 39 Edgemont Rd Braintree, Massachusetts 02184 / US | 05 /
FIELD, Ryan 4034 Madison Ave Culver City, CA 90232 / US | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/12] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18815092.4 | 28.11.2018 | [2021/12] | WO2018US62777 | Priority number, date | US201862673065P | 17.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862673065 P | US201862687659P | 20.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862687659 P | US201816051462 | 31.07.2018 Original published format: US201816051462 | WO2018US58580 | 31.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/US2018/058580 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019221784 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3794375 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3794375 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/4861, G01S7/4863, G01S17/18, G01J1/44, A61B5/00, A61B5/24 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/0059 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/107 (US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,KR);
A61B5/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/40 (EP);
A61B5/4064 (KR);
A61B5/6803 (EP,KR);
G01J1/44 (EP,KR);
G01S17/18 (EP,KR);
G01S17/89 (KR);
G01S7/4861 (EP);
G01S7/4863 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/022408 (US);
H01L31/035272 (US);
H04N25/70 (US);
A61B2505/09 (KR);
A61B2560/0214 (KR);
A61B2562/0233 (KR);
A61B2562/046 (KR);
A61B2562/166 (KR);
A61B5/369 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | G01S17/10, G01S7/486, G01J1/44, A61B5/0476, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTINVASIVE AM KÖRPER TRAGBARE GEHIRN-SCHNITTSTELLEN-SYSTEME | [2021/12] | English: | NON-INVASIVE WEARABLE BRAIN INTERFACE SYSTEMS | [2021/12] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'INTERFACE CÉRÉBRAL VESTIMENTAIRE NON INVASIFS | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 15.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2021 | Observations by third parties | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | LU | 28.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
LU | 28.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5090415 (YAMASHITA TAKAJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9,14,28 * figure 1 * * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - line 49 * * column 2, line 55 - line 58 * [I] 4-8,10-13,15; | [A]US2009012402 (MINTZ FREDERICK W [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 5,7 * * abstract *; | [A]US2014191115 (WEBSTER ERIC ALEXANDER GARNER [GB], et al) [A] 16,20,29 * figure 2 * * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0010] , [0014] , [0016] * | Examination | US2014275891 | WO2018033751 | - PIFFERI ANTONIO ET AL, "New frontiers in time-domain diffuse optics, a review", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, vol. 21, no. 9, doi:10.1117/1.JBO.21.9.091310, ISSN 1083-3668, (20160901), page 91310, (20160617), XP060075645 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.JBO.21.9.091310 | other | US2014275891 | WO2018033751 | - Pifferi Antonio; Contini Davide; Mora Alberto Dalla; Farina Andrea; Spinelli Lorenzo; Torricelli Alessandro, "New frontiers in time-domain diffuse optics, a review", Journal of Biomedical Optics, (20160617), vol. 21, no. 9, page 091310, XP060075645 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.JBO.21.9.091310 |